Prime Engineering Incorporated v. A-Prime Engineering LLC
Plaintiff: Prime Engineering Incorporated
Defendant: A-Prime Engineering LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00600
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prime Engineering Incorporated. (Owens, Paul)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A-Prime Engineering LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael)
June 20, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael James Berchou on behalf of A-Prime Engineering LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berchou, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Prime Engineering Incorporated. Prime Engineering Incorporated waiver sent on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Owens, Paul)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Report on the Filing or Determination of Patent or Trademark Case sent to USPTO. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint)(KLH)
May 10, 2019 Remark: Original summons not submitted. (KLH)
May 10, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (KLH)
May 10, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
May 9, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number BUF064319 (KLH)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A-Prime Engineering LLC, filed by Prime Engineering Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prime Engineering Incorporated v. A-Prime Engineering LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-Prime Engineering LLC
Represented By: Michael James Berchou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime Engineering Incorporated
Represented By: Paul S Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?