Reiffer v. A2A Energy International, LLC
Plaintiff: Paul Reiffer
Defendant: A2A Energy International, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00606
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A2A Energy International, LLC. (Slama, Mark)
July 1, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (CGJ)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. The defendant's time to answer or otherwise make motions with respect to the complaint is extended to 7/24/2019. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/28/2019. (CMD)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by A2A Energy International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amit Singhai in Support of A2A Energy International, LLC's Motion For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, #2 Letter to Judge Vilardo)(Slama, Mark)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Reiffer. A2A Energy International, LLC served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to A2A Energy International, LLC. (KM)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Report on the Filing or Determination of a Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed to the Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (KM)
May 17, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KM)
May 17, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
May 17, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against A2A Energy International, LLC $ 400 receipt number 0209-3447589, filed by Paul Reiffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reiffer v. A2A Energy International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Reiffer
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A2A Energy International, LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Slama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?