Lockridge v. Erie County State Supreme Court

Petitioner: Vern R. Lockridge
Respondent: Erie County State Supreme Court
Case Number: 1:2019cv00616
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 PETITIONER'S RESPONSE to re #11 Order filed by Vern R. Lockridge. (KM)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY from Pro Se Paralegal to Plaintiff's #6 Letter. (KM) A copy of document mailed to plaintiff.
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 , #10 motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and ordering Lockridge to show cause in writing, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, why the petition should not be dismissed for failure to exhaust state judicial remedies. Lockridge's failure to comply with this order as directed will result in the automatic dismissal of the petition under Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Court without further order or notice to him. If Lockridge does not show cause as directed above by the deadline, the Clerk of the Court shall dismiss the petition without prejudice. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/25/2019. Chambers mailed a copy of order to pro se plaintiff on 6/25/2019 (LCH)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vern R. Lockridge.(KLH)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #6 Letter from the Pro Se Paralegal. (KM)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case by Vern R. Lockridge.(KM)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vern R. Lockridge.(KM)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Vern Ramon Lockridge, dated 5/30/2019, to Office of the Clerk (Attachments: #1 attachment) (KM)
May 28, 2019 Remark: A copy of #4 Order, #5 Judgment and a blank in forma pauperis motion mailed to petitioner. (KM)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT in favor of Erie County State Supreme Court against Vern R. Lockridge. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 5/28/2019. (KM)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action without prejudice and without assessing the filing fee. If Lockridge wishes to re-open this action, he shall so notify this Court in writing, no later than thirty days from the date of this order. The writing shall include either a properly supported motion to proceed in forma pauperis or the filing fee of $5.00. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 5/23/2019. (KM)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Vern R. Lockridge to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Vern R. Lockridge. (KLH)
May 13, 2019 Remark: Petitioner mailed a Pro Se packet including Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KM)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Attachment to #1 complaint by Vern R. Lockridge - Manually filed due to size. Document maintained in the Clerk's file. (KM) Modified docket entry on 5/17/2019 (KM).
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Vern R. Lockridge. (Attachments: #1 envelope, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KM) Modified on 5/16/2019 (KM). (Original document maintained in case file due to poor legibility)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lockridge v. Erie County State Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Erie County State Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vern R. Lockridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?