Williams v. Monroe County Jail Superintendent

Petitioner: Chad S. Williams
Respondent: Monroe County Jail Superintendent
Case Number: 1:2019cv00619
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Remark: Petitioner's address has been updated from Monroe County Jail to Elmira Correctional Facility. (KLH)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 Amendment by Chad W. Williams. (KLH)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Chad Williams, to Pro Se Paralegal. (KLH)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT administratively terminating this action without prejudice. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 6/11/2019. Copy mailed to Petitioner. (KLH) Modified on 6/11/2019 (KLH).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action without prejudice without filing the petition or assessing a filing fee; that if the petitioner wishes to re-open this action, he shall so notify this Court, in writing, no later than thirty days from the date of this order to include either a motion to proceed in forma pauperis with signed prison certification section or the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/11/2019. Copy mailed to Petitioner along with a blank form motion to proceed in forma pauperis.(KLH)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 Pro Se Response dated 6/5/2019 to Chad S. Williams regarding #5 Letter. (KLH)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT with Summonses by Chad S. Williams. (KLH)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for an investigation by Chad S. Williams.(KLH)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Chad S. Williams.(KLH)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Chad Williams, dated 5/15/2019, to Clerk. (KLH)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Brief of Arguments regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Chad S. Williams. (KLH)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Local District Judge by Chad S. Williams.(KLH)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Chad S. Williams.(KLH)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Chad S. Williams.(KLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Monroe County Jail Superintendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chad S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Monroe County Jail Superintendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?