McLellan v. The Travelers Companies, Inc.

Plaintiff: harold m mclellan and Harold M. McLellan
Defendant: Travelers Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00626
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: H Kenneth Schroeder
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Stipulation of Selection of Mediator due by 9/5/2019; Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 9/13/2019; First Mediation Session due by 9/30/2019; Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 2/28/2020; Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 3/30/2020; Discovery completed by 5/31/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2020; Mediation To End by 7/30/2020. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 6/25/2019. (LMG)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 DISCOVERY PLAN by Travelers Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Visco, Betsy)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER regarding issuance of Case Management Order. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 6/4/19. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order Form, #2 Consent Memorandum, #3 Consent Form)(LMG)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 6/4/2019. (KM)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John Wallace on behalf of Travelers Companies, Inc. (Wallace, John)
May 15, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (KLH)
May 15, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
May 15, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc. for Travelers Companies, Inc... (Visco, Betsy)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Companies, Inc. d/b/a Travelers Insurance from NYS Supreme Court, Erie County, case number 803795/2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3451708), filed by Travelers Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibits A-D, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(Visco, Betsy)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants Travelers Compnaies, Inc d/b/a Travelers Insurance from Erie County Supreme Court, case number 803795/2019. (Attachments: #1 Index to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibits A-D, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(Visco, Betsy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLellan v. The Travelers Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: harold m mclellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold M. McLellan
Represented By: John J. Fromen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Betsy F. Visco
Represented By: John Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?