New York Life Insurance Company v. Oldham et al

Plaintiff: New York Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Gus Oldham and Cherylynn Oldham
Case Number: 1:2019cv00669
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by New York Life Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of Answer by Pro Se Defendant Cherylynn Oldham (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Connolly, Deirdre)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New York Life Insurance Company. Cherylynn Oldham served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Connolly, Deirdre)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cherylynn Oldham, Gus Oldham. (KLH)
May 23, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (KLH)
May 23, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
May 23, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by New York Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Order for Deposit of Interpleader Funds and Related Relief)(Connolly, Deirdre)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New York Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent New York Life Insurance Company for New York Life Insurance Company.. (Connolly, Deirdre)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3460752, filed by New York Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons as to Cherylynn Oldham, #7 summons as to Gus Oldham)(Connolly, Deirdre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Life Insurance Company v. Oldham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gus Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherylynn Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Deirdre A. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?