Senor v. Whitaker et al
Petitioner: Chanel Senor
Respondent: Thomas Feeley, Matthew G. Whitaker, Jefferey Searls and William P. Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv00716
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 PETITIONER'S REPLY to re #12 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Chanel Senor. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(KM)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jefferey Searls re #11 Response to Habeas Petition, #12 Memorandum in Opposition (Khalil, Adam)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jefferey Searls. (Khalil, Adam)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 Answer and Return RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jefferey Searls. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of DO Fiorotto, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of DO Fiorotto, #3 Declaration of DO Hobart)(Khalil, Adam)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER. The pro se petitioner, Chanel Senor, filed a petition seeking a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241, Docket Item 1, and the Court issued a scheduling order directing the respondents to file an answer and memorandum of law in response to the petition within 45 days of the date of the scheduling order, Docket Item 2. The petitioner has filed a motion to amend the petition and a "new"--that is, amended--petition. Docket Item 8. Accordingly, the motion to amend the petition is GRANTED, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(A); Rules 1(b) and 12 of Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. The respondents shall therefore file their answer and memorandum of law, as set forth in the scheduling order, in response to the amended petition. The scheduling order remains unchanged, including the respondents time in which to file their answer and memorandum of law. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/27/2019. Chambers mailed a copy of order to pro se plaintiff on 6/27/2019. (LCH)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 **DISREGARD - FILED ON WRONG CASE**Letter from Charles M. Pellis to Court. (Petitioner's address has been updated from Oswego Correctional to Elmira Correctional Facility.) (KLH) Modified on 6/27/2019 (KLH).
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Chanel Senor.(KLH)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying without prejudice #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate the Motion #6 and re-docket it as a memorandum of law in support of the petition. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/20/2019. (KM)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM of LAW in Support of the Petition by Chanel Senor.(KLH) Modified on 6/21/2019 pursuant to #7 Order.(KM)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam A. Khalil on behalf of William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jefferey Searls (Khalil, Adam)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Chanel Senor.(KM)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Chanel Senor. (Attachments: #1 attachment, #2 envelope)(KM)
June 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that within 45 days of the date of this order, the Respondent shall file and serve an answer and a memorandum of law. The Respondent may file instead of his answer, a motion to dismiss within 45 days of the date of this order. The Petitioner shall have 25 days after his receipt of the respondent's answer, memorandum of law or motion to dismiss to file a written response. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 petition)(KM)A copy of this order mailed to petitioner.
June 3, 2019 Remark: Petitioner mailed a Pro Se packet including Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KM)
June 3, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number BUF064588. (KM)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Chanel Senor. (Attachments: #1 envelope, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Senor v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Feeley
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Represented By: Adam A. Khalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew G. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferey Searls
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Represented By: Adam A. Khalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Represented By: Adam A. Khalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chanel Senor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?