Singh v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Baljinder Singh
Respondent: Jefferey Searls, Thomas Feeley and William P. Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv00732
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that within 45 days of the service of this order, Respondent shall file and serve an answer and memorandum of law or a motion to dismiss the Petition; Petitioner shall have 25 days upon receipt of the answer to file a written response ; the Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of the Petition together with this Order as directed. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Petition) Copy mailed to Petitioner.(KLH)
June 6, 2019 Remark: Petitioner has been mailed a pro se packet including Privacy Notice and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KLH)
June 5, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number BUF064653 (KLH)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Baljinder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferey Searls
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Feeley
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Baljinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?