Murray v. Williamsville Central School District
Plaintiff: PATRICK F MURRAY and Patrick F. Murray
Defendant: WILLIAMSVILLE CENTRAL SCHOOL DISTRICT
Case Number: 1:2019cv00750
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER. The Stipulation to extend the Defendant's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint through and including August 16, 2019 is HEREBY APPROVED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 7/26/2019.(JCM)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L. Wood on behalf of Williamsville Central School District (Wood, Katherine)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Schillaci on behalf of Williamsville Central School District (Schillaci, Andrea)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and Order extending time to respond to complaint by Williamsville Central School District. (Schillaci, Andrea)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, the Defendant's #5 Motion for an Extension of the due date for the Answer to the Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant's time to answer the Complaint is extended to 7/29/2019. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 6/21/2019. (MEAL)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Williamsville Central School District. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Dechert, Heather)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Dechert on behalf of Williamsville Central School District (Dechert, Heather)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Williamsville Central School District on 6/14/2019, filed by Patrick F. Murray. (Korn, Lindy)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Williamsville Central School District. (KLH)
June 10, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution (KLH)
June 10, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
June 10, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against WILLIAMSVILLE CENTRAL SCHOOL DISTRICT $ 400 receipt number 0209-3478297, filed by PATRICK F MURRAY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 WCSD Summons)(Korn, Lindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Williamsville Central School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK F MURRAY
Represented By: Lindy Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick F. Murray
Represented By: Lindy Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAMSVILLE CENTRAL SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Katherine L. Wood
Represented By: Heather Dechert
Represented By: Andrea Schillaci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?