Haner v. Niagara County
Plaintiff: Traci Haner
Defendant: Niagara County
Case Number: 1:2019cv00754
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Traci Haner. All Defendants. (Richmond, Anna)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Claude A. Joerg, Esq., Niagara County Attorney on 6/20/2019 by Traci Haner. Waiver of Service due by 7/22/2019. (Richmond, Anna)
June 10, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KM)
June 10, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
June 10, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Traci Haner. to #1 Complaint (Civil cover Sheet) filed by Traci Haner. (Richmond, Anna)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Complaint (Plaintiff's verification) by Traci Haner. (Richmond, Anna)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Niagara County $ 400 receipt number 0209-3478667, filed by Traci Haner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Richmond, Anna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haner v. Niagara County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niagara County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Haner
Represented By: Anna Marie Richmond
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Tommaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?