Radley v. Ambienti Design Inc.
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Radley
Defendant: Ambienti Design Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00783
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER re #8 Notice of Settlement filed by Patricia Ann Radley. This Court having been advised that this case has been settled, it is hereby ordered that this case is dismissed with the right, to re-open upon good cause shown within 30 days, if settlement is not consummated. Further, the parties are directed to file with the Clerk of Court a stipulation of discontinuance on or before 9/3/2019. Further, that the Clerk of Court is hereby directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/31/2019. (CMD)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Patricia Ann Radley (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 31, 2019 Remark: Chambers mailed a copy of text order to Darren G. Henriet. (CMD)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST AND ORDER. The defendant's request to extend time to answer or otherwise make motions with respect to the complaint is extended to 8/28/2019. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/30/2019. (CMD)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. The defendant's time to answer or otherwise make motions with respect to the complaint is extended to 7/31/2019. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/11/2019. (CMD)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Patricia Ann Radley.(Liebowitz, Richard)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright has been mailed to the Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (NRE)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ambienti Design Inc.. (NRE)
June 14, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(NRE)
June 14, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (NRE)
June 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo and Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (NRE)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ambienti Design Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3484920, filed by Patricia Ann Radley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radley v. Ambienti Design Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Radley
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ambienti Design Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?