Turner v. Capital Management Services, LP
Plaintiff: Sherry A. Turner
Defendant: Capital Management Services, LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00788
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Leslie G Foschio
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2019 11:00 AM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 7/30/2019. (SDW)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Leslie G. Foschio, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/25/2019. (CMD)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Capital Management Services, LP. (NRE)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Capital Management Services, LP.(Del Valle, Michael)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Default by Sherry A. Turner against Capital Management Services, LP. (Sanders, Craig)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER Case reassigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Hon. William M. Skretny no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Mary C. Lowenguth, Clerk of Court. (SG)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherry A. Turner. Capital Management Services, LP served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Barshay, David)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Capital Management Services, LP. (KM)
June 17, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KM)
June 17, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
June 17, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Barshay on behalf of Sherry A. Turner (Barshay, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Sherry A. Turner. filed by Sherry A. Turner. (Sanders, Craig)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital Management Services, LP $ 400 receipt number 0209-3486639, filed by Sherry A. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Capital Management Services, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry A. Turner
Represented By: David Michael Barshay
Represented By: Craig B. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Management Services, LP
Represented By: Michael Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?