Decker v. Security Credit Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Thomas Decker
Defendant: Security Credit Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00789
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Security Credit Systems, Inc..(Fjermedal, Glenn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Security Credit Systems, Inc.. (Fjermedal, Glenn)
July 11, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER. The #4 Stipulation to Extend the Defendant's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's complaint, through and including August 12, 2019 is HEREBY APPROVED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 7/10/2019. (JCM)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #3 Summons Returned Executed To Extend Time to Answer by Security Credit Systems, Inc.. (Fjermedal, Glenn)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Decker. Security Credit Systems, Inc. served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Andrews, Seth)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Security Credit Systems, Inc.. (KLH)
June 17, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution (KLH)
June 17, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
June 17, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Security Credit Systems, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3487282, filed by Thomas Decker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Andrews, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Decker v. Security Credit Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Credit Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn M. Fjermedal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Decker
Represented By: Seth Andrews
Represented By: Kenneth R. Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?