Curtin v. Creek Bend Apartment et al

Plaintiff: Margaret Curtin
Defendant: Judge Andrew Fleming, Gayle Kerney, Village of Hamburg, Mary Beth Healy, Bruce Koren, Manager of Bldg. Creek Bend Apts., Creek Bend Apartment, Whitney Management, David Henry, Hilton Garden Inn, Lafayette Hotel and Citizens Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv00811
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Margaret Curtin, dated 8/2/2019, to To Whom it may Concern. (KM)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE regarding copy work fee by Margaret Curtin. (KM)
July 26, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Citizens Bank, Creek Bend Apartment, Andrew Fleming, Mary Beth Healy, David Henry, Hilton Garden Inn, Gayle Kerney, Bruce Koren, Lafayette Hotel, Manager of Bldg. Creek Bend Apts., Village of Hamburg, Whitney Management, filed by Margaret Curtin.(KM)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION to Expedite Case by Margaret Curtin.(KM)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Andrew Fleming, Mary Beth Healy, Village of Hamburg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael P. McClaren, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Memorandum in Support, #5 Certificate of Service)(McClaren, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Creek Bend Apartment, Andrew Fleming, Mary Beth Healy, David Henry, Hilton Garden Inn, Gayle Kerney, Bruce Koren, Lafayette Hotel, Manager of Bldg. Creek Bend Apts., Village of Hamburg, Whitney Management, filed by Margaret Curtin.(NRE)
June 21, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(NRE)
June 21, 2019 Remark: Plaintiff has been given a pro se packet including Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge, Pro Se Assistance Program Information, and ADR Notification. (NRE)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Margaret Curtin.(NRE)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Creek Bend Apartment, Andrew Fleming, Mary Beth Healy, Gayle Kerney, Bruce Koren, Manager of Bldg. Creek Bend Apts., Village of Hamburg, filed by Margaret Curtin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(NRE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtin v. Creek Bend Apartment et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Andrew Fleming
Represented By: Michael P. McClaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle Kerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Hamburg
Represented By: Michael P. McClaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Beth Healy
Represented By: Michael P. McClaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Koren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manager of Bldg. Creek Bend Apts.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creek Bend Apartment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Garden Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafayette Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Curtin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?