Buczek v. Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, PC et al
Appellee: Seterus, Inc., MTGLQ Investors, LP, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Federal National Mortgage Association, Internal Revenue Service, Christine M. Fox, Shapiro, DiCaro & Barak, LLC, KeyBank, N.A., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Jane Does, Michael J. Chatwin, Robert W. Griswold, Tina M. Genovese, Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, PC and John Does
Appellant: Deborah Ann Buczek
Case Number: 1:2019cv00880
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd A. Ritschdorff on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ritschdorff, Todd)
August 21, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems identifying Corporate Parent MERSCORP Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., Other Affiliate Maroon Holding, LLC. for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems.. (Griswold, Robert)
August 21, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Griswold on behalf of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (Griswold, Robert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 23 Supplemental Record on Appeal - Designation of Additional Items by Appellee HSBC Bank USA, N.A. Transcript at BK Dkt #88 filed separately at as a transcript. (Attachments: #1 Dkt 98, #2 Dkt 14, #3 Dkt 17, #4 Dkt 21, #5 Dkt 22, #6 Dkt 23, #7 Dkt 27, #8 Dkt 28, #9 Dkt 31, #10 Dkt 32, #11 Dkt 33, #12 Dkt 34, #13 Dkt 35, #14 Dkt 29, #15 Dkt 40, #16 Dkt 41, #17 Dkt 42, #18 Dkt 43, #19 Dkt 44, #20 Dkt 45, #21 Dkt 46, #22 Dkt 47, #23 Dkt 48, #24 Dkt 49, #25 Dkt 52, #26 Dkt 54, #27 Dkt 59, #28 Dkt 63, #29 Dkt 64) (KLH)
August 16, 2019 Filing 22 *BK Dkt #88* NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 19, 2019, before U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Michael J. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Diane S. Martens, Contact Info 585-613-4311. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2019. (KLH)
August 16, 2019 Filing 21 Supplemental Record on Appeal - Designation of Additional Items by Appellee KeyBank, N.A. Transcript at BK Dkt #88 filed separately as a transcript. (Attachments: #1 Dkt 97, #2 Dkt 7, #3 Dkt 16, #4 Dkt 31, #5 Dkt 54, #6 BK Docket Sheet reflecting text only entries at #55, #56, and #57, #7 Dkt 61) (KLH)
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 Supplemental Record on Appeal - Designation of Additional Items by Appellee MTGLQ Investors, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Dkt 95, #2 Dkt 95 Continued, #3 Dkt 7, #4 Dkt 14, #5 Dkt 15, #6 Dkt 16, #7 Dkt 20, #8 Dkt 39) (KLH)
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 Supplemental Record on Appeal - Designation of Additional Items by Appellees Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, Seterus, Inc., Federal National Mortgage Association, Shapiro, DiCaro & Barak, LLC, Michael J. Chatwin, and Robert Griswold. (Attachments: #1 Dkt 94-1, #2 Dkt 94-2, #3 Dkt 94-3, #4 Dkt 94-4, #5 Dkt 15) (KLH)
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Bankruptcy Proceedings held on June 19, 2019, before Judge Michael J. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Diane S. Martens, Contact Info 585-613-4311. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2019. (KLH)
July 24, 2019 Filing 17 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Deborah Ann Buczek to #6 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by Deborah Ann Buczek. (Attachments: #1 BK doc. #92, #2 BK doc. #85, #3 BK doc. #7, #4 Transcript to be filed separately)(KLH)
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Ann Bivona on behalf of MTGLQ Investors, LP (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of Notice of Appearance)(Bivona, Beth)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank E. Morreale on behalf of MTGLQ Investors, LP (Morreale, Frank)
July 23, 2019 E-Filing Notification: #14 Corrected Corporate Disclosure Statement by MTGLQ Investors, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service )(Bivona, Beth) Modified on 7/23/2019 to correct title (KLH). (KLH)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 Corrected Corporate Disclosure Statement by MTGLQ Investors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service )(Bivona, Beth) Modified on 7/23/2019 to correct title (KLH).
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MTGLQ Investors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bivona, Beth)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ritschdorff, Todd)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shapiro, DiCaro & Barak, LLC. (Griswold, Robert)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Griswold, Robert)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC.. (Griswold, Robert)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KeyBank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Keycorp for KeyBank, N.A... (Hawkins, Jonathan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S Hawkins on behalf of KeyBank, N.A. (Hawkins, Jonathan)
July 11, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Corrected Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 1-18-11401-CLB, AP 1-19-01008-CLB . File received, filed by Deborah Ann Buczek. (Attachments: #1 BK transmittal, #2 BK Order #59, #3 BK Order #60, #4 BK Order #61, #5 BK Order #62, #6 BK Order #63)(KLH)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Griswold on behalf of Michael J. Chatwin, Federal National Mortgage Association, Robert W. Griswold, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Seterus, Inc., Shapiro, DiCaro & Barak, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Griswold, Robert)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE regarding #2 Bankruptcy Appeal. (KLH)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Deficiency Notice. (KLH)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 1-18-11401-CLB, A.P. No. 1-19-01008-CLB. File received, filed by Deborah Ann Buczek. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Transmittal)(KLH)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deborah Ann Buczek.(KLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buczek v. Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, PC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Seterus, Inc.
Represented By: Robert William Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MTGLQ Investors, LP
Represented By: Beth Ann Bivona
Represented By: Frank E. Morreale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Represented By: Robert William Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Robert William Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Christine M. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Shapiro, DiCaro & Barak, LLC
Represented By: Robert William Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KeyBank, N.A.
Represented By: Jonathan S Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Robert William Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Todd A. Ritschdorff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael J. Chatwin
Represented By: Robert William Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Robert W. Griswold
Represented By: Robert William Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tina M. Genovese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Deborah Ann Buczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?