White and Sikorski, as Owners and/or Owners pro hac vice of a 1985, 34-foot J-BOAT sailing vessel
Defendant: Tracy Deleo
Petitioner: Jocelyn Sikorski and Frederick White
Case Number: 1:2019cv00900
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael J Roemer
Referring Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER. Hon. Michael J. Roemer, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall not hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C), unless further ordered by this Court. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 9/5/2019. (JCM)
August 30, 2019 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(KLH)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 CLAIM Claim in Limitation of Tracy Deleo by Tracy Deleo. (Hudson, Timothy)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tracy Deleo.(Hudson, Timothy)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability issued by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court. (KLH)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER RESTRAINING SUITS, APPROVING PETITIONERS' SECURITY, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND THE FILING OF CLAIMS. Signed by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 7/24/2019. (JCM)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
July 10, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KLH)
July 10, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
July 10, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Parties $ 400 receipt number 0209-3511825, filed by Frederick White, Jocelyn Sikorski. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Supplement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mercante, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White and Sikorski, as Owners and/or Owners pro hac vice of a 1985, 34-foot J-BOAT sailing vessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jocelyn Sikorski
Represented By: James E. Mercante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frederick White
Represented By: James E. Mercante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Deleo
Represented By: Timothy Michael Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?