MDC Eastern Hills, LLC, as Successor by Merger to Glenmont MDC Eastern Hills, LLC v. Cellular Sales of New York, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MDC Eastern Hills, LLC, as Successor by Merger to Glenmont MDC Eastern Hills, LLC
Defendant: Cellular Sales of New York, LLC and Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00913
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(SG)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc., Cellular Sales of New York, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation of Service)(Carbo, Charles)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT the #4 #5 Motions for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Julie Rachelle Offerman, Esq. and C. Larry Carbo, III, Esq., are GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/23/2019. (CMD)
July 23, 2019 Verified admission to the Texas State Bar for Attorney Charles L. Carbo III (CGJ)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cellular Sales of New York, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cellular Sales of New York, LLC for Cellular Sales of New York, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Affirmation of Service)(Gwitt, Brian)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc., Cellular Sales of New York, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc. for Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Affirmation of Service)(Gwitt, Brian)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of C. Larry Carbo, III, ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3526787.) by Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc., Cellular Sales of New York, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Sponsoring Affidavit of Brian D. Gwitt, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Database Information, #5 Attorney's Oath, #6 Oath of Office, #7 E-filing Registration, #8 Petition, #9 Affirmation of Service)(Gwitt, Brian)
July 22, 2019 Verified admission to the Texas State Bar for Attorney Julie Rachelle Offerman (CGJ)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3525886.) by Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc., Cellular Sales of New York, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Julie R. Offerman), #2 Affidavit Sponsoring Affidavit of Brian D. Gwitt, Esq., #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #5 Attorney Database Form, #6 Appendix to Civility Principles, #7 Attorney's Oath, #8 Application of Julie R. Offerman, #9 Certificate of Service Affirmation of Service)(Gwitt, Brian)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER. The #2 stipulation for extension of time to answer is HEREBY SO ORDERED. The defendant's time to answer or otherwise make motions with respect to the complaint is extended to 8/1/2019. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/17/2019. (CMD)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc., Cellular Sales of New York, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service Affirmation of Service)(Gwitt, Brian)
July 12, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (NRE)
July 12, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(NRE)
July 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (NRE)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc., Cellular Sales of New York, LLC from Erie County Supreme Court, case number 807403/2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3516761), filed by Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc., Cellular Sales of New York, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Affirmation of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gwitt, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MDC Eastern Hills, LLC, as Successor by Merger to Glenmont MDC Eastern Hills, LLC v. Cellular Sales of New York, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellular Sales of New York, LLC
Represented By: Brian D. Gwitt
Represented By: Charles L. Carbo, III
Represented By: Julie R. Offerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc.
Represented By: Brian D. Gwitt
Represented By: Charles L. Carbo, III
Represented By: Julie R. Offerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MDC Eastern Hills, LLC, as Successor by Merger to Glenmont MDC Eastern Hills, LLC
Represented By: Raymond C. Stilwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?