Morataya-Lopez v. Searls et al
Petitioner: Clara Luz Morataya-Lopez
Respondent: Thomas E. Feeley, Kevin K. McAleenan, William P. Barr and Jefferey J Searls
Case Number: 1:2019cv00925
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER. The petitioner has notified the Court that she wishes to withdraw this action. Docket Item 4. She has been released from detention by the United States Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Id. at 3; Docket Item 4-1, Exh. A. Because no answer or motion for summary judgment has been filed by any adverse party, the notification is treated as a voluntary withdrawal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i); Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts, Rules 1(b) and 12. The petition is hereby dismissed without prejudice. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 8/27/2019. (CMD)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Clara Luz Morataya-Lopez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ICE Letter of Release)(Moravec, Joseph)
July 26, 2019 Remark: A copy of #3 Order was not mailed to petitioner. (KM)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that within 45 days of the date of this order, the Respondents shall file and serve an answer and a memorandum of law. The Petitioner shall have 25 days after his receipt of the respondents'answer a written response. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(KM)(A copy of the order was mailed to the petitioner.)
July 15, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (NRE)
July 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (NRE)
July 13, 2019 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS Civil Cover Sheet. (Moravec, Joseph)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0209-3518582.), filed by Clara Luz Morataya-Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Appear, #2 Exhibit Petitioner's Bond Evidence, #3 Exhibit IJ's Bond Memorandum, #4 Exhibit BIA Bond Appeal Decision)(Moravec, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morataya-Lopez v. Searls et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas E. Feeley
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferey J Searls
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clara Luz Morataya-Lopez
Represented By: Joseph David Moravec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?