Bedard v. DePuy Orthopaedic, Inc et al
Plaintiff: James Bedard
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson International, DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., DePuy International Limited, Johnson & Johnson, DePuy Orthopaedic, Inc, DePuy Products, Inc., DePuy, Inc., DePuy Synthes Products, Inc., Niagara Frontier Orthopaedic Supplies LLC and Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00976
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 65557 (SG)
August 15, 2019 Case Opened in the Northern District of Texas under case number 3:19-cv-01944 (CGJ)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 MULTIDISTRICT CONDITIONAL LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER transferring the action to the Northern District of Texas. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi,Clerk of the Panel on 08/13/19. (CGJ)
August 2, 2019 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(KLH)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedic, Inc, DePuy Products, Inc., DePuy Synthes Products, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Murdica, James)
August 1, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (CGJ)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedic, Inc, DePuy Products, Inc., DePuy Synthes Products, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.. (Murdica, James)
July 26, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KM)
July 26, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
July 26, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
July 26, 2019 E-Filing Notification regarding # 2 Corporate Disclosure. Filer should refile the corporate disclosure using the (Corporate Disclosure Statement)event found in "Other Documents. (KM)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Service by DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedic, Inc, DePuy Products, Inc., DePuy Synthes Products, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International. (Murdica, James)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedic, Inc, DePuy Products, Inc., DePuy Synthes Products, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International from State of New York, Supreme Court, County of Erie, case number 802624/2019. (Attachments: #1 Index identifying documents filed or served in State Court, #2 Corporate Disclosure, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murdica, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bedard v. DePuy Orthopaedic, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson International
Represented By: James F. Murdica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Represented By: James F. Murdica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International Limited
Represented By: James F. Murdica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: James F. Murdica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedic, Inc
Represented By: James F. Murdica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Products, Inc.
Represented By: James F. Murdica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy, Inc.
Represented By: James F. Murdica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Products, Inc.
Represented By: James F. Murdica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niagara Frontier Orthopaedic Supplies LLC
Represented By: James F. Murdica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Represented By: James F. Murdica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bedard
Represented By: Theresa M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?