DiPizio Construction Company, Inc. v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Plaintiff: DiPizio Construction Company, Inc.
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01065
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER GRANTING the parties' joint #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion to dismiss, ECF No. #10 , is due by 11/7/19, and Defendant may reply by 11/15/19. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/1/19. (JO)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or based upon Court's inherent powers (consent motion to extend Plaintiff's time to respond to motion to dismiss) by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order dismissing bankruptcy)(Friedman, Adam)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or based upon Court's inherent powers by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Adam P. Friedman in support, #2 Exhibit A (Verified Complaint), #3 Exhibit B (Second Amended Complaint in prior pending action), #4 Exhibit C (Plaintiff's Answer in prior pending action), #5 Exhibit D (Travelers' notice of motion for partial summary judgment in prior pending action), #6 Exhibit E (excerpt of Plaintiff's brief in opposition to Travelers' motion in prior pending action), #7 Exhibit F (report and recommendation in prior pending action), #8 Exhibit G (excerpt of Plaintiff's objections to report and recommendation in prior pending action), #9 Exhibit H (decision and order awarding Travelers partial summary judgment in prior pending action), #10 Exhibit I (judgment in prior pending action), #11 Memorandum in Support of motion to dismiss, #12 Certificate of Service)(Friedman, Adam)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DiPizio Construction Company, Inc.. (Isaacs, Daniel)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc. for Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.. (Friedman, Adam)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford no longer assigned to the case. (KM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Reassign Case. This matter is hereby transferred to the Hon. Frank P. Geraci for all further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/30/2019. (KAC)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
August 27, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Reassign Case (letter addressed to Clerk of the Court pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.1(e)) by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(Friedman, Adam)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant's response to the Complaint is due on or before 9/20/2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/16/2019. (KAC)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(Friedman, Adam)
August 14, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(NRE)
August 14, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (NRE)
August 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (NRE)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Notice of Removal, (index of documents filed in state court action). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (notice of appearance in state court action), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Adam)
August 13, 2019 E-Filing Notification: regarding #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Friedman, Adam). No Index to State Court Record filed. Attorney is directed to use the continuation of exhibits event to file the Index. (NRE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Erie, case number 806422/2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3549812), filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (state court Summons and Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (affidavit of service of Summons and Complaint))(Friedman, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiPizio Construction Company, Inc. v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Adam P. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DiPizio Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel William Isaacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?