Karen Flores v. Fisher-Price, Inc
Plaintiff: Karen Flores
Defendant: Fisher-Price, Inc.
Intervenor: Mark Nabong, Cassandra Mulvey, Katherine Shaffer, Zachary Mundy, Emily Barton, Rebecca Drover, Candace Kimmel and Samantha Drover-Mundy
Case Number: 1:2019cv01076
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL for 1:19-CV-1075 and 1:19-CV-1076: MDL No. 19-MD-2903 has been opened and assigned to Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. See MDL Docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC, 1:19-cv-01075-GWC, 1:19-cv-01076-GWC (JHF)
August 14, 2019 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:19-cv-01073.
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 TRANSMITTAL LETTER - MDL CASE TRANSFER OUT: A certified copy of the MDL 2903 Transfer Order with electronic docket sheet sent to USDC Western District of New York at Buffalo on 8/13/19. (bm) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 18 TRANSFER ORDER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2903, transferring case to USDC, Western District of New York at Buffalo and assigned to Honorable Geoffrey W. Crawford. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-03209 VAP(MAAx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge John D. Early and Judge James V. Selna to Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-01073 VAP(MAAx). Signed by Judge Virginia A. Phillips (rn) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF A MOTION TO TRANSFER BEFORE THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION #13 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT this case is stayed, including but not limited to responsive pleading deadlines and related briefing schedules, status conferences, and/or discovery deadlines, until the Judicial Panel for Multidistrict Litigation has ruled on the Motion for Transfer in In re: Fisher-Price Rock 'N Play Marketing, Sales Practices, and Product Liability Litigation, MDL No. 2903. (es) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Intervenor Parties Emily Barton, Cassandra Mulvey, Mark Nabong, Katherine Shafferto Stipulation to Stay Case, #13 Proposed Intervenors' Notice Concerning the Parties' Joint Stipulation to Stay This Action (Byrd, Rachele) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Motion for Transfer Before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendant Fisher-Price, Inc.(Attorney Adrianne E Marshack added to party Fisher-Price, Inc(pty:dft))(Marshack, Adrianne) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing of Motion for Transfer of Actions filed by Defendant Fisher-Price, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Motion for Transfer of Actions, #2 Memorandum Amended Memorandum in Support of Motion for Transfer of Actions, #3 Second Amended Schedule of Actions, #4 Declaration of Craig de Recat, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Declaration of Adrianne Marshack, #22 Exhibit A to Declaration of Adrianne Marshack, #23 Exhibit B to Declaration of Adrianne Marshack, #24 Exhibit C to Declaration of Adrianne Marshack, #25 Exhibit D to Declaration of Adrianne Marshack, #26 Exhibit E to Declaration of Adrianne Marshack, #27 Exhibit F to Declaration of Adrianne Marshack, #28 Exhibit G to Declaration of Adrianne Marshack, #29 Exhibit H to Declaration of Adrianne Marshack)(Marshack, Adrianne) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Daniel Tepper in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of New York #10 filed by Intervenor Parties Emily Barton, Rebecca Drover, Samantha Drover-Mundy, Candace Kimmel, Cassandra Mulvey, Zachary Mundy, Mark Nabong, Katherine Shaffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Byrd, Rachele) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of New York filed by Intervenors Emily Barton, Cassandra Mulvey, Katherine Shaffer, Mark Nabong, Candace Kimmel, Samantha Drover-Mundy, Zachary Mundy, Rebecca Drover. Motion set for hearing on 7/15/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Rachele R Byrd added to party Emily Barton(pty:intv), Attorney Rachele R Byrd added to party Cassandra Mulvey(pty:intv), Attorney Rachele R Byrd added to party Katherine Shaffer(pty:intv), Attorney Rachele R Byrd added to party Mark Nabong(pty:intv), Attorney Rachele R Byrd added to party Candace Kimmel(pty:intv), Attorney Rachele R Byrd added to party Samantha Drover-Mundy(pty:intv), Attorney Rachele R Byrd added to party Zachary Mundy(pty:intv), Attorney Rachele R Byrd added to party Rebecca Drover(pty:intv)) (Byrd, Rachele) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Alison S. Gokal on behalf of Plaintiff Karen Flores. Filed by Plaintiff Karen Flores (Hoover, Adam) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Karen Flores. upon Fisher-Price, Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Adrianne E. Marshack. (Hoover, Adam) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Karen Flores. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-03209 (Hoover, Adam) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Karen Flores, (Hoover, Adam) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Karen Flores. (Hoover, Adam) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23842201 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Karen Flores. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supporting Exhibits) (Attorney Adam T Hoover added to party Karen Flores(pty:pla))(Hoover, Adam) [Transferred from cacd on 8/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karen Flores v. Fisher-Price, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisher-Price, Inc.
Represented By: Adrianne E Marshack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Mark Nabong
Represented By: Jonathan A. Sorkowitz
Represented By: Andrew J. Lorin
Represented By: Brittany DeJong
Represented By: Kristin Darr
Represented By: Kate M McGuire
Represented By: Melody McGowin
Represented By: Stephen P. DeNittis
Represented By: Rachele R Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Cassandra Mulvey
Represented By: Jonathan A. Sorkowitz
Represented By: Andrew J. Lorin
Represented By: Brittany DeJong
Represented By: Kristin Darr
Represented By: Kate M McGuire
Represented By: Melody McGowin
Represented By: Stephen P. DeNittis
Represented By: Rachele R Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Katherine Shaffer
Represented By: Jonathan A. Sorkowitz
Represented By: Andrew J. Lorin
Represented By: Brittany DeJong
Represented By: Kristin Darr
Represented By: Kate M McGuire
Represented By: Melody McGowin
Represented By: Stephen P. DeNittis
Represented By: Rachele R Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Zachary Mundy
Represented By: Jonathan A. Sorkowitz
Represented By: Andrew J. Lorin
Represented By: Brittany DeJong
Represented By: Kristin Darr
Represented By: Kate M McGuire
Represented By: Melody McGowin
Represented By: Stephen P. DeNittis
Represented By: Rachele R Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Emily Barton
Represented By: Jonathan A. Sorkowitz
Represented By: Andrew J. Lorin
Represented By: Brittany DeJong
Represented By: Kristin Darr
Represented By: Melody Lynn McGowin
Represented By: Kate M McGuire
Represented By: Stephen P. DeNittis
Represented By: Rachele R Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Rebecca Drover
Represented By: Jonathan A. Sorkowitz
Represented By: Andrew J. Lorin
Represented By: Brittany DeJong
Represented By: Kristin Darr
Represented By: Kate M McGuire
Represented By: Melody McGowin
Represented By: Stephen P. DeNittis
Represented By: Rachele R Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Candace Kimmel
Represented By: Jonathan A. Sorkowitz
Represented By: Andrew J. Lorin
Represented By: Brittany DeJong
Represented By: Kristin Darr
Represented By: Kate M McGuire
Represented By: Melody McGowin
Represented By: Stephen P. DeNittis
Represented By: Rachele R Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Samantha Drover-Mundy
Represented By: Jonathan A. Sorkowitz
Represented By: Andrew J. Lorin
Represented By: Brittany DeJong
Represented By: Kristin Darr
Represented By: Kate M McGuire
Represented By: Melody McGowin
Represented By: Stephen P. DeNittis
Represented By: Rachele R Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Flores
Represented By: Marc G Reich
Represented By: Alison S Gokal
Represented By: Adam T Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?