Up State Tower Co., LLC et al v. The City of North Tonawanda New York et al
Plaintiff: Buffalo-Lake Erie Wireless Systems Co., LLC and Up State Tower Co., LLC
Defendant: City of North Tonawanda, Common Coucil for the City of North Tonawanda, The Common Council of the City of North Tonawanda, New York and The City of North Tonawanda New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv01082
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles D. Grieco on behalf of The City of North Tonawanda New York, The Common Council of the City of North Tonawanda, New York (Grieco, Charles)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Buffalo-Lake Erie Wireless Systems Co., LLC, Up State Tower Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Devendorf, Jon)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint on the Common Council of the City of North Tonawanda served on Luke Brown, Attorney on 9/6/19, filed by Buffalo-Lake Erie Wireless Systems Co., LLC, Up State Tower Co., LLC. (Devendorf, Jon)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint on the City of North Tonawanda served on Luke Brown, Attorney on 9/6/19, filed by Buffalo-Lake Erie Wireless Systems Co., LLC, Up State Tower Co., LLC. (Devendorf, Jon)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Buffalo-Lake Erie Wireless Systems Co., LLC, Up State Tower Co., LLC. (Devendorf, Jon)
August 22, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (CGJ)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The City of North Tonawanda New York, The Common Council of the City of North Tonawanda, New York. (KLH)
August 15, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KLH)
August 15, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
August 15, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of North Tonawanda, Common Coucil for the City of North Tonawanda $ 400 receipt number 0209-3553252, filed by Buffalo-Lake Erie Wireless Systems Co., LLC, Up State Tower Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to City of North Tonawanda, #3 Summons to the Common Council of North Tonawanda, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Devendorf, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Up State Tower Co., LLC et al v. The City of North Tonawanda New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of North Tonawanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Common Coucil for the City of North Tonawanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Common Council of the City of North Tonawanda, New York
Represented By: Charles D. Grieco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of North Tonawanda New York
Represented By: Charles D. Grieco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buffalo-Lake Erie Wireless Systems Co., LLC
Represented By: Jon P. Devendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Up State Tower Co., LLC
Represented By: Jon P. Devendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?