United States of America for the Use and Benefit of CIR Electrical Construction Corp. et al v. Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Plaintiff: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of CIR Electrical Construction Corp. and CIR Electrical Construction Corp.
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Case Number: 1:2019cv01145
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (KM)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by CIR Electrical Construction Corp., United States of America for the Use and Benefit of CIR Electrical Construction Corp.. to #1 Complaint, Summons - refiled omitting date filed by CIR Electrical Construction Corp., United States of America for the Use and Benefit of CIR Electrical Construction Corp.. (Gismondi, Geffrey)
August 28, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(NRE)
August 27, 2019 E-Filing Notification: regarding #1 COMPLAINT against Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. Summons is dated and should be left blank. Attorney is directed to re-submit using the Continuation of Exhibits event found under Responses and Replies. (NRE)
August 27, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (NRE)
August 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (NRE)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland $ 400 receipt number 0209-3565648, filed by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of CIR Electrical Construction Corp., CIR Electrical Construction Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gismondi, Geffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of CIR Electrical Construction Corp. et al v. Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of CIR Electrical Construction Corp.
Represented By: Geffrey Gismondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CIR Electrical Construction Corp.
Represented By: Geffrey Gismondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?