Posso et al v. Niagara University
Plaintiff: Jaime Rolf, Nastassa Posso and Jane Doe-1
Defendant: Niagara University
Case Number: 1:2019cv01293
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Niagara University, filed by Nastassa Posso, Jane Doe-1, Jaime Rolf, Jane Doe-2. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Buth, Cheryl)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy A. Colby on behalf of Niagara University (Colby, Jeremy)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER re #6 Stipulation for extension of time to answer is HEREBY SO ORDERED. The defendant's time to answer or otherwise make motions with respect to the complaint is extended to 12/6/2019. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 10/7/2019. (CMD)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel James Altieri on behalf of Niagara University (Altieri, Daniel)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Green Sewruk on behalf of Niagara University (Sewruk, Julia)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel James Altieri on behalf of Niagara University (Altieri, Daniel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L. Hemenway on behalf of Niagara University (Hemenway, Amy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION re Time to Respond to Complaint by Niagara University. (Hemenway, Amy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Niagara University. (Hemenway, Amy)
October 3, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
October 3, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG)
October 3, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint (Civil Cover Sheet). (Melber, Brian)
September 24, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Attorney is directed to file a civil cover sheet using the Continuation of Exhibits event, found under Responses and Replies. (SG)
September 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie A. Baker on behalf of Jaime Rolf (Baker, Laurie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl Meyers Buth on behalf of Jaime Rolf (Buth, Cheryl)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Niagara University $ 400 receipt number 0209-3594681, filed by Nastassa Posso, Jane Doe-1.(Melber, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Posso et al v. Niagara University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Rolf
Represented By: Cheryl Meyers Buth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nastassa Posso
Represented By: Brian Melber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe-1
Represented By: Brian Melber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niagara University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?