Papero v. Roswell Park Comprehensive Cancer Center et al
Plaintiff: Julie A Papero
Defendant: Laurel Dibrog, Roswell Park Comprehensive Cancer Center and Heidi Findlay
Case Number: 1:2019cv01309
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: H Kenneth Schroeder
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Jane McCulle on behalf of Julie A Papero (McCulle, Catherine)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER regarding issuance of Case Management Order. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 11/12/19. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order Form, #2 Consent Memorandum, #3 Consent Form)(LMG)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr., United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/12/2019. (CMD)
November 7, 2019 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(KLH)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Laurel Dibrog, Heidi Findlay, Roswell Park Comprehensive Cancer Center.(Schroder, Ginger)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER re #8 Joint Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond is HEREBY SO ORDERED. The defendants' time to answer or otherwise make motions with respect to the complaint is extended to 11/6/2019. Because this is the third extension granted, no further extensions will be granted without a motion based on good cause. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 10/28/2019. (CMD)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Laurel Dibrog, Heidi Findlay, Roswell Park Comprehensive Cancer Center. (Schroder, Ginger)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED TEXT ORDER re #5 Joint Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond is HEREBY SO ORDERED. The Defendants' time to answer or otherwise make motions with respect to the complaint is extended to 10/25/2019. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 10/17/2019. (CMD)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER re #5 Joint Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Roswell Park Comprehensive Cancer Center is HEREBY SO ORDERED. The defendants' time to answer or otherwise make motions with respect to the complaint is extended to 10/18/2019. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 10/16/2019. (CMD)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Roswell Park Comprehensive Cancer Center. (Schroder, Ginger)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roswell Park Comprehensive Cancer Center. (Schroder, Ginger)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER re #2 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Roswell Park Comprehensive Cancer Center is HEREBY SO ORDERED. The defendants' time to answer or otherwise make motions with respect to the complaint is extended to 10/18/2019. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 10/5/2019. (CMD)
October 7, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Roswell Park Comprehensive Cancer Center. (Schroder, Ginger)
September 26, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KLH)
September 26, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
September 26, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Laurel Dibrog, Heidi Findlay, Roswell Park Comprehensive Cancer Center from NYS Supreme Court, County of Erie, case number 811224/2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3599671), filed by Laurel Dibrog, Heidi Findlay, Roswell Park Comprehensive Cancer Center. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index of Documents Filed with State Court, #3 Certificate of Service)(Schroder, Ginger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Papero v. Roswell Park Comprehensive Cancer Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie A Papero
Represented By: Lindy Korn
Represented By: Catherine Jane McCulle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurel Dibrog
Represented By: Ginger D. Schroder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roswell Park Comprehensive Cancer Center
Represented By: Ginger D. Schroder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Findlay
Represented By: Ginger D. Schroder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?