D'Angelo v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Brianna D'Angelo
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01346
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah J McCarthy
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff shall respond to defendant's motion #7 for Judgment on the Pleadings by December 4, 2019; defendant's response shall be filed by December 11, 2019; and oral argument is scheduled for December 16, 2019 at 4:00 PM. Counsel may appear in person or participate by telephone upon advance notice to chambers. For those electing to participate by telephone, dial (703) 724-3100, enter access code 4100030#, and then pin 9999#. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 11/13/19. (DAZ)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dan D. Kohane, Esq., #2 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #3 Affidavit Ivor Stoodley, #4 Exhibit A - Policy, #5 Exhibit B - Disclaimer, #6 Memorandum in Support)(Kohane, Dan)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 12/16/2019 at 04:00 PM before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 11/12/19. (DAZ)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/12/2019. (CMD)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Kohane, Dan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine North America, Inc. for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.. (Kohane, Dan)
October 7, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (CGJ)
October 2, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KLH)
October 2, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
October 2, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal served on Richard P. Amico, Esq. on 10/02/2019, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Kohane, Dan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company from Erie County Supreme Court, case number 811209/2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3608161), filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kohane, Dan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Angelo v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Dan D. Kohane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna D'Angelo
Represented By: Richard P. Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?