Dudley v. Venettozzi et al
Plaintiff: Latiff Dudley
Defendant: Donald Venettozzi, Bishop and Capt. Drumsta
Case Number: 1:2019cv01375
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-07764.
October 2, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Western District of New York. (rjm) [Transferred from nysd on 10/9/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Mailed a copy of #3 Order, to Latiff Dudley 60-1 Farragut Ave Apt. 1 Staten Island, NY 10303. (aea) [Transferred from nysd on 10/9/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER. Plaintiff's claims arose in the Clinton Correctional Facility, located in Erie County, which is in the Western District of New York. See 28 U.S.C. 112(d). Accordingly, venue lies in the Western District of New York, 28 U.S.C. 1391(b)(2), and the Court transfers this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York, 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/2/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from nysd on 10/9/2019.]
October 2, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm) [Transferred from nysd on 10/9/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 10/9/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Bishop, Drumsta, Donald Venettozzi. Document filed by Latiff Dudley. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 10/9/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Latiff Dudley. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 10/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dudley v. Venettozzi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Venettozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Drumsta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latiff Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?