Dobrasz et al v. J. C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barbara Dobrasz and Alexander Dobrasz
Defendant: J. C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01379
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER regarding issuance of Case Management Order. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 10/22/19. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order Form, #2 Consent Memorandum, #3 Consent Form)(LMG)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/18/2019. (KLH)
October 16, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KM)
October 16, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
October 16, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
October 16, 2019 Filing fee paid electronically on 10/3/2019: $400.00, receipt number 0209-3609308. (KM)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J. C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. (Wilkins, Christopher)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by J. C. Penney Corporation, Inc. from Supreme Court, Erie County, case number 805749/2019., filed by J. C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disclosure Statement, #3 Index of Filings, #4 Jury Demand, #5 Certificate of Service)(Wilkins, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobrasz et al v. J. C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Dobrasz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Dobrasz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher E. Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?