Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Ball, et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Defendant: Michael T. Ball and Lila B. Ball
Case Number: 1:2019cv01441
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Lila B. Ball, Michael T. Ball. (KM)((A copy of document mailed to each defendants.)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Default by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB against Lila B. Ball, Michael T. Ball. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit NMA)(Vargas, Stephen)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Michael T. Ball served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Lila B. Ball served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Bebirian, Nicholas)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lila B. Ball, Michael T. Ball. (KM)
October 29, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
October 29, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB identifying Corporate Parent WSFS Financial Corporation for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB.. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lila B. Ball, Michael T. Ball $ 400 receipt number 0209-3633800, filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for all Defendants, #3 Certificate of Merit Pursuant to CPLR 3012-B)(Bebirian, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Ball, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T. Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lila B. Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Nicholas John Bebirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?