Groves et al v. Capital Link Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Susanna Groves, Eddie Beausoliel, Eddie Murdock and Andrew Murdock
Defendant: Capital Link Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01491
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER denying #3 Motion to Dismiss as moot. Plaintiffs have filed an Amended Complaint (Dkt. 7) that "[a]t least on its face... appears to address th[e] alleged defects" identified in the pending motion to dismiss the original Complaint. McIntyre v. City of Rochester, 228 F. Supp. 3d 241, 242 (W.D.N.Y. 2017). Accordingly, the Court denies Defendant's motion to dismiss the original Complaint as moot. See id. (finding that "the filing of the amended complaint moots the motion to dismiss the original complaint"). SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 12/27/2019. (CDH)
December 26, 2019 Remark: Pursuant to Amended Complaint, caption of docket amended to reflect that Eddie Murdock is no longer a plaintiff and Andrew Murdock has been added as a plaintiff. (JMM)
December 25, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT as a Matter of Course against Capital Link Management, LLC, filed by Susanna Groves, Eddie Murdock, Eddie Beausoliel.(Hilton, Jonathan)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital Link Management, LLC. (O'Brien, Sean)
December 9, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER re #3 Motion to Dismiss. Responses are due on or before January 2, 2019. Replies are due on or before January 9, 2019. Upon receipt of all papers, the Court will determine if oral argument is necessary and, if so, will inform the parties of the date and time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 12/05/2019. (CDH)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M O'Brien on behalf of Capital Link Management, LLC (O'Brien, Sean)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Capital Link Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Little, Brendan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Capital Link Management, LLC. (NRE)
November 6, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(NRE)
November 6, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (NRE)
November 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (NRE)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital Link Management, LLC $ 400 receipt number 0209-3641950, filed by Susanna Groves. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Hilton, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groves et al v. Capital Link Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Link Management, LLC
Represented By: Brendan H. Little
Represented By: Sean M O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanna Groves
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Beausoliel
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Murdock
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Murdock
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?