Love v. National Debt Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: Billy Ray Love
Defendant: National Debt Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01492
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christina Clair Reiss
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Please note: This docket entry does not contain every detail of this order. It is your responsibility to read and download the pdf to this document for future reference. Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2020 03:30 PM in US Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. Christina Clair Reiss, who will appear by videoconference. Signed by Hon. Christina Clair Reiss on 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order Template)(KLH)
December 23, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (CGJ)
December 19, 2019 NOTICE OF Set/Reset Hearings: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2020 03:30 PM in US Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. Christina Clair Reiss. (LMD)
December 18, 2019 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(KLH)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by National Debt Holdings, LLC.(Gutowski, David)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint . (Hilton, Jonathan)
November 6, 2019 E-Filing Notification regarding #1 COMPLAINT: Filer is directed to re-file completed civil cover sheet reflecting the county of residence of defendant. (KLH)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to National Debt Holdings, LLC. (KLH)
November 6, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KLH)
November 6, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
November 6, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Christina Clair Reiss. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Debt Holdings, LLC $ 400 receipt number 0209-3641970, filed by Billy Ray Love. (Attachments: #1 Errata Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hilton, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. National Debt Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Debt Holdings, LLC
Represented By: David E. Gutowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Ray Love
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?