United States of America v. $4,790.00 United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $4,790.00 United States Currency
Claimant: Dominic D. Edwards
Case Number: 1:2019cv01568
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 CLAIM by Dominic D. Edwards. (SG)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Kane, Mary)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION signed by Trish Young filed by United States of America (Declaration of Publication). (Kane, Mary)
November 22, 2019 ARREST WARRANT IN REM issued by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court. Warrant Hearing set for 2/7/2020 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. (SG)
November 21, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
November 21, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary C. Kane on behalf of United States of America (Kane, Mary)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $4,790.00 United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Arrest Warrant In Rem, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kane, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $4,790.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,790.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mary C. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dominic D. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?