Palmer v. Receivables Performance Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Robert Palmer
Defendant: Receivables Performance Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01575
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER. The #4 Stipulation to extend the Defendant's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's complaint, through and including January 30, 2020 is HEREBY APPROVED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 1/2/2020. (JCM)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Summons Returned Executed Stipulation by Receivables Performance Management, LLC.(Fjermedal, Glenn)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Palmer. Receivables Performance Management, LLC served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Hilton, Jonathan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Receivables Performance Management, LLC. (KM)
November 22, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KM)
November 22, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
November 22, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Receivables Performance Management, LLC $ 400 receipt number 0209-3658994, filed by Robert Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Hilton, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Receivables Performance Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Receivables Performance Management, LLC
Represented By: Glenn M. Fjermedal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Palmer
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?