Majerowicz et al v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: James Majerowicz and Rose Ann Majerowicz
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01594
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael J Roemer
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER - Hon. Michael J. Roemer, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall not hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C), unless further ordered by this Court. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 1/15/2020. (CMD)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION that a Magistrate Judge be assigned to this action by Speedway LLC.(Hannah, Brittany)
January 5, 2020 E-Filing Notification regarding #5 LETTER: this document contains a request for relief and should be filed as a motion. ACTION REQUIRED: Re-file document using the motion event.(SG)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 Letter filed by Speedway LLC as to Speedway LLC requesting assignment of Magistrate Judge. (Hannah, Brittany)
November 25, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
November 25, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (CGJ)
November 25, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Supreme Court Notice of Removal served on Dennis J. Garvey, Esq. of the Law Offices of Jaworski & Giacobbe on November 22, 2019, filed by Speedway LLC. (Hannah, Brittany)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Speedway LLC. (Hannah, Brittany)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Speedway LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation for Speedway LLC.. (Hannah, Brittany)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Speedway LLC from Erie County Supreme Court, case number 809251/2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3661575), filed by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Attached Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Summons and Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit Verified Answer, #4 Exhibit Request for Supplemental Demand for Relief, #5 Exhibit Response to 3017c Demand for Relief, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hannah, Brittany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Majerowicz et al v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Majerowicz
Represented By: Dennis J. Garvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Ann Majerowicz
Represented By: Dennis J. Garvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Brittany L. Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?