Gurbacki v. Walco Electric Co et al
Plaintiff: Austin Gurbacki
Defendant: Quality Products Inc, Dynics Inc, Walco Electric Co, SPX Corporation, Right Lane Capital LLC, FENN LLC, United Dominion Industries, Walco Mfg Corp, Walco Electric Company, Walco Manufacturing Corp., Ann Arbor Technologies Corp., Dynics, Inc., Walco Manufacturing Corp. doing business as Walco, Walco Electric Company doing business as Walco and Fenn LLC doing business as Fenn Manufacturing doing business as The Fenn Manufacturing Co. doing business as Fenn-Torin doing business as Fenn doing business as USA.Fenn
Case Number: 1:2019cv01656
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: H Kenneth Schroeder
Referring Judge: John L Sinatra
2 Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER regarding issuance of Case Management Order. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 8/14/20. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order Form, #2 Consent Memorandum, #3 Consent Form)(LMG)
July 23, 2020 Filing 39 UDI's ANSWER to Complaint Cross-Claim of Dynics Inc by United Dominion Industries.(DiPalma, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2020 Filing 38 UDI's ANSWER to Complaint Cross-Claim of Walco Electric Co by United Dominion Industries.(DiPalma, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2020 Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal of causes of action by plaintiff against UDI by United Dominion Industries. (DiPalma, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2020 Filing 36 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Cross-Claims Against SPX & UDI by Fenn LLC. (DiPalma, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2020 Filing 35 TEXT ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: United Dominion Industries answer due 7/24/2020. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 6/23/2020. (KER)
June 23, 2020 Filing 34 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,, by United Dominion Industries.(DiPalma, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2020 E-Filing Notification: #33 Letter filed by United Dominion Industries. This document contains a request for relief and should be filed as a motion. ACTION REQUIRED: Re-file document using the motion event. E-Filing Notification: Document contains so ordered line and should be submitted via e-mail to the assigned judge. Refer to the Administrative Guide for e-mail addresses. (DiPalma, Jeffrey) (BK)
June 22, 2020 Filing 33 Letter filed by United Dominion Industries as to Right Lane Capital LLC, Walco Electric Company, Ann Arbor Technologies Corp., Quality Products Inc, Walco Manufacturing Corp., Dynics, Inc., United Dominion Industries, Fenn LLC, SPX Corporation requesting extention to answer on consent. (DiPalma, Jeffrey)
March 30, 2020 Filing 32 TEXT ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer: United Dominion Industries answer due 6/23/2020. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 3/30/2020. (KER)
March 26, 2020 E-Filing Notification: Document contains so ordered line and should be submitted via e-mail to the assigned judge. Refer to the Administrative Guide for e-mail addresses. No action required #31 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (BK)
March 25, 2020 Filing 31 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United Dominion Industries.(DiPalma, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2020 E-Filing Notification: Document contains so ordered line and should be submitted via e-mail to the assigned judge. Refer to the Administrative Guide for e-mail addresses. No action required #30 Notice of Substitution of Counsel: Jeffrey P DiPalma is substituted for James H. Phillips, Eric R. Fish, Gregory C. Ulmer, Francesca Perkins Austin. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP. (DiPalma, Jeffrey) (BK)
March 2, 2020 Filing 30 Notice of Substitution of Counsel: Jeffrey P DiPalma is substituted for James H. Phillips, Eric R. Fish, Gregory C. Ulmer, Francesca Perkins Austin. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP. (DiPalma, Jeffrey)
February 26, 2020 Filing 29 TEXT ORDER granting consent #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by United Dominion Industries. Answer is now due 3/26/2020. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 2/26/20. (HKG)
February 26, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by United Dominion Industries.(Perkins Austin, Francesca)
February 26, 2020 E-Filing Notification: #27 Letter filed by United Dominion Industries. This document contains a request for relief and should be filed as a motion. ACTION REQUIRED: Re-file document using the motion event. (TF)
February 25, 2020 Filing 27 Letter filed by United Dominion Industries as to Right Lane Capital LLC, Walco Electric Company, Ann Arbor Technologies Corp., Quality Products Inc, Walco Manufacturing Corp., Dynics, Inc., United Dominion Industries, Fenn LLC, SPX Corporation . (Perkins Austin, Francesca)
February 18, 2020 Filing 26 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to the Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court, on February 18, 2020. (JMM)
February 4, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by John Wallace on behalf of Walco Electric Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wallace, John)
January 20, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Guyder Felter on behalf of Dynics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Felter, Karen)
January 20, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by Dynics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Felter, Karen)
January 17, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #9 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, filed by Co-Defendants Fenn, LLC and Quality Products, Inc. filed by SPX Corporation. (Phillips, James)
January 17, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, filed by Co-Defendant Dynics, Inc. by SPX Corporation.(Phillips, James)
January 16, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Francesca Perkins Austin on behalf of SPX Corporation (Perkins Austin, Francesca)
January 16, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Clayton Ulmer on behalf of SPX Corporation (Ulmer, Gregory)
January 15, 2020 E-Filing Notification: #16 NOTICE by SPX Corporation, re #5 Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel (Phillips, James) Modified on 1/15/2020 to remove United Dominion Industries as a filer (SG). (SG)
January 13, 2020 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (CGJ)
January 9, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Hulslander on behalf of Dynics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 corporate disclosure, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hulslander, Kevin)
January 9, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 1/9/2020. (CMD)
January 8, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by SPX Corporation, re #5 Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel (Phillips, James) Modified on 1/15/2020 to remove United Dominion Industries as a filer (SG).
January 8, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by United Dominion Industries filed by United Dominion Industries. The defendant's time to answer or otherwise make motions with respect to the complaint is extended to 2/27/2020. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 1/7/2020. (CMD)
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by United Dominion Industries. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Answer the Complaint)(Fish, Eric)
January 2, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walco Electric Company, Walco Manufacturing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fabrizi, Leo)
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Leo T. Fabrizi on behalf of Walco Electric Company, Walco Manufacturing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fabrizi, Leo)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPX Corporation. (Fish, Eric)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Dominion Industries. (Fish, Eric)
December 30, 2019 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(KLH)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 Fenn & QPI's ANSWER to Complaint with, CROSSCLAIM against Ann Arbor Technologies Corp., Dynics, Inc., SPX Corporation, United Dominion Industries, Walco Electric Company, Walco Manufacturing Corp. by Quality Products Inc, Fenn LLC.(DiPalma, Jeffrey)
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quality Products Inc. (DiPalma, Jeffrey)
December 24, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United Dominion Industries. The defendant's time to answer or otherwise make motions with respect to the complaint is extended to 1/6/2020. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 12/23/2019. (CMD)
December 23, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (CGJ)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United Dominion Industries. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Fish, Eric)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Fish on behalf of SPX Corporation, United Dominion Industries (Fish, Eric)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER. The #3 stipulation for extension of time to answer is HEREBY SO ORDERED. Defendants, Fenn LLC and Quality Products Inc.'s time to answer or otherwise make motions with respect to the complaint is extended to 1/6/2020. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 12/16/2019. (CMD)
December 13, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
December 13, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(CGJ)
December 13, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION to extend the time to respond by Fenn LLC, Quality Products Inc. (DiPalma, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number ROC011941 (CGJ)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing by Fenn LLC, Quality Products Inc. (DiPalma, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2019 No fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted and advised they have 24 hours to resolve the matter. (CGJ)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Quality Products Inc, FENN LLC from Erie County, case number 813140/2019., filed by Quality Products Inc, FENN LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Cert of Incorp FENN LLC, #3 Exhibit C Cert of Incorp QPI, #4 Exhibit D Cert of Incorp Walco Elec, #5 Exhibit E Cert of Merger Walco Mfg, #6 Exhibit F Cert of Incorp SPX Corp, #7 Exhibit G Cert of Incorp Right Lane Capital LLC, #8 Exhibit H Cert of Merger United Dominion Ind, #9 Exhibit I Cert of Incorp Dynics Inc, #10 Exhibit J Cert of dissolution Ann Arbor Tech, #11 Exhibit K Filed State Court Documents, #12 Declaration L. Fabrizi Esq, #13 Declaration K. Hulslander Esq, #14 Declaration F. Perkins Austin Esq, #15 Exhibit O Settlement Agreement Albino v Global Equip USA Ltd, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(DiPalma, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gurbacki v. Walco Electric Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Products Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey P. DiPalma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walco Electric Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Clayton Ulmer
Represented By: Eric R. Fish
Represented By: Francesca Perkins Austin
Represented By: James Eldon Phillips
Represented By: Jeffrey P. DiPalma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Right Lane Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FENN LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey P. DiPalma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Dominion Industries
Represented By: Eric R. Fish
Represented By: Francesca Perkins Austin
Represented By: Jeffrey P. DiPalma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walco Mfg Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walco Electric Company
Represented By: Leo T. Fabrizi
Represented By: John Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walco Manufacturing Corp.
Represented By: Leo T. Fabrizi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Arbor Technologies Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynics, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Guyder Felter
Represented By: Kevin E. Hulslander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walco Manufacturing Corp. doing business as Walco
Represented By: Leo T. Fabrizi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walco Electric Company doing business as Walco
Represented By: Leo T. Fabrizi
Represented By: John Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fenn LLC doing business as Fenn Manufacturing doing business as The Fenn Manufacturing Co. doing business as Fenn-Torin doing business as Fenn doing business as USA.Fenn
Represented By: Jeffrey P. DiPalma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Gurbacki
Represented By: Christopher M. Pannozzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?