Peerless Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Peerless Insurance Company
Defendant: AO Smith Corp., Regal Beloit, Broan-Nutone, LLC, Nutone Inc., AO Smith Corporation and Regal Beloit Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01696
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Substitution of Counsel: Robert G. Scumaci is substituted for Dennis A. First. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP (Scumaci, Robert)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by AO Smith Corporation, Regal Beloit Corporation of Related Case Filing (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Declaration in support of Motion to Consolidate, #3 Exhibit A to Motion to Consolidate, #4 Exhibit B to Motion to Consolidate, #5 Exhibit C to Motion to Consolidate, #6 Exhibit D to Motion to Consolidate, #7 Memorandum in Support)(Scumaci, Robert)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Krzykowski on behalf of Broan-Nutone, LLC, Nutone Inc., Regal Beloit Corporation (Krzykowski, Brian)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regal Beloit Corporation. (First, Dennis)
December 23, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (CGJ)
December 23, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
December 23, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
December 23, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(CGJ)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Notice of Removal, Demand for Jury & 7.1 Statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Statement, #2 7.1 Statement, #3 7.1 Statement)(First, Dennis)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Regal Beloit, Nutone Inc., Broan-Nutone, LLC from Chautauqua Supreme Court, case number EK12019001754. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3687465), filed by Regal Beloit, Nutone Inc., Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(First, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peerless Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AO Smith Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Beloit
Represented By: Dennis A. First
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Represented By: Dennis A. First
Represented By: Brian P. Krzykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutone Inc.
Represented By: Dennis A. First
Represented By: Brian P. Krzykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AO Smith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Beloit Corporation
Represented By: Dennis A. First
Represented By: Brian P. Krzykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peerless Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?