United States of America v. Bouter et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: XYZ Corporation, Rural Housing Opportunities Corporation, John Doe, Shirley E. Bouter and Mary Roe
Case Number: 1:2019cv01708
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. John Doe served on 1/13/2020, answer due 2/3/2020; Mary Roe served on 1/13/2020, answer due 2/3/2020; Rural Housing Opportunities Corporation served on 1/13/2020, answer due 2/3/2020. (Malone, Cynthia)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Labletta, Nicole)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Shirley E. Bouter, John Doe, Mary Roe, Rural Housing Opportunities Corporation, XYZ Corporation. (CGJ)
December 27, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
December 27, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons, #5 summons, #6 summons)(Labletta, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bouter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rural Housing Opportunities Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley E. Bouter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole Bernadette Labletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?