Bietz et al v. City of Niagara Falls et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Lee George, Charles Brundidge, Jr., James L. Dolson, Dean Knotts, Jonathan David Hamilton, Sr., Melissa D'Angelo, Jason T. Martin, Sr., Richard Kutis, Eddie Burnett, Megan Mackenna, Deborah Chambers, Charles Brundidge, Sr., Monique Cole, Maria D. Cox, Rico D. Johnson, Lisa M. Jamieson, Michelle Martin Welch, Tianna T. Hilson, Patricia Henderson, Bianco Crowell, Stephen Alexander Hamilton, Lisa Marie Cosimano, Christopher Mackenna, Robert Howard, Mark Martin, Jr., Richard Bietz, Hazel Graham, Clara Dunn, Charlotte C. Cevaer-Lachat and Allison Mackenna
Defendant: Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Scott Lawn Yard, Inc., Cecos International, Inc., Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, OP-TECH Environmental Services, Roy's Plumbing, Inc. and City of Niagara Falls
Case Number: 1:2020cv00138
Filed: February 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Referring Judge: Jeremiah J McCarthy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Ann Rauh on behalf of Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc. (Rauh, Patricia)
February 27, 2020 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cecos International, Inc.. (Knaub, Zackary)
February 21, 2020 Filing 32 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with today's conference, the February 7, 2020 "Consented to Motions Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaints" are granted. As agreed to by counsel, plaintiffs' motion to remand (on procedural and subject matter jurisdiction grounds) shall be filed by March 16, 2020, and so long as plaintiffs' motion is filed by that deadline, defendants waive any challenge (before this court or on appeal) to the timeliness of that motion. Defendants' response shall be filed by April 30, 2020; plaintiffs' reply, if any, shall be filed by May 20, 2020; and oral argument of the motion is scheduled for May 28, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel may appear in person or participate by telephone. For those electing to participate by telephone, dial (703) 724-3100, enter access code 4100030#, and then pin 9999# sufficiently in advance of the conference. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 2/21/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00136-FPG-JJM et al.(DAZ)
February 21, 2020 CALENDAR EVENT : Oral Argument set for 5/28/2020 at 02:00 PM before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00136-FPG-JJM et al.(DAZ)
February 21, 2020 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Status Conference held on 2/21/2020. Discussion regarding remand motion to be filed by March 16, 2020; responses on or before April 30, 2020; replies on or before May 20, 2020 and oral argument set for May 28, 2020 at 2:00 PM. APPEARANCES: Charles S. Siegel (via telephone), Melissa L. Stewart (via telephone) for plaintiff; Jeffrey F. Baase for defendant Niagara Falls Water Board; Deena Katherine Mueller-Funke, Douglas E. Fleming, III (via telephone), Kevin M. Hogan for defendants Glenn Springs, Miller Springs and Occidental Chemical; Jeffrey C. Stravino for defendant Conestoga-Rovers; Zackary Knaub (via telephone) for defendant CECOS; Jeffrey D. Schulman (via telephone) for defendant OP-Tech; Alice J. Cunningham for defendant Roy's Plumbing; Mariana Murray for defendant Scott Lawn Yard; Agnes Wilewicz (via telephone) for defendant Sevenson. (FTR GOLD) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00136-FPG-JJM et al.(DAZ)
February 20, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Zackary Knaub on behalf of Cecos International, Inc. (Knaub, Zackary)
February 19, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Russo on behalf of Cecos International, Inc. (Russo, Steven)
February 19, 2020 Verified admission to the Western District of New York for Attorney Mara Gonzalez. (CGJ)
February 18, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A. Kraus on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kraus, Peter)
February 14, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Agnieszka Anna Wilewicz on behalf of Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc. (Wilewicz, Agnieszka)
February 14, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Siegel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Siegel, Charles)
February 14, 2020 Filing 25 TEXT ORDER: A status conference is scheduled for February 21, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. Counsel may appear in person or participate by telephone. For those electing to participate by telephone, dial (703) 724-3100, enter access code 4100030#, and then pin 9999# sufficiently in advance of the conference. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 2/14/2020. (JD)
February 13, 2020 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Conestoga-Rovers & Associates identifying Corporate Parent GHD Services, Inc., Corporate Parent GHD Holdings (U.S.) LLC for Conestoga-Rovers & Associates.. (Stravino, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice J. Cunningham on behalf of Roy's Plumbing, Inc. (Cunningham, Alice)
February 13, 2020 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roy's Plumbing, Inc.. (Knoer, Robert)
February 13, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Knoer on behalf of Roy's Plumbing, Inc. (Knoer, Robert)
February 12, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie C. MacLean on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MacLean, Leslie)
February 12, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc.. (Wilewicz, Agnieszka)
February 11, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scott Lawn Yard, Inc.. (Sutter, Brian)
February 11, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OP-TECH Environmental Services identifying Corporate Parent NRC US Holding Company, LLC, Corporate Parent JFL-NRC Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent NRC Group Holdings Corp, Corporate Parent US Ecology Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent US Ecology, Inc., Corporate Parent NRC Group Holdings, LLC for OP-TECH Environmental Services.. (Schulman, Jeffrey)
February 11, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa L. Stewart on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stewart, Melissa)
February 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Phillips on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Phillips, Steven)
February 10, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy and Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy The Magistrate Judge is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 2/10/20. (BJJ)
February 10, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and for Extension of Time for Defendants' to Respond to Complaints by Cecos International, Inc., City of Niagara Falls, Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., OP-Tech Environmental Services, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Roy's Plumbing, Inc., Scott Lawn Yard, Inc., Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., Cecos International, Inc, Cecos International, Inc., Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, City of Niagara Falls, Niagara Falls Water Board, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Occidental Petroleum Corporation (Hooker), Oxy, Inc., Roy's Plumbing, Inc..Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00136-FPG et al.(Hogan, Kevin)
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER re: status report filed by USA, Docket Item 355 . The case will remain open and a further status report shall be filed by 5/31/2020. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 2/7/20. Associated Cases: 1:79-cv-00988-LJV et al.(CEH)
February 7, 2020 Case assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation re #2 Continuation of Exhibits, #1 Notice of Removal,,, and on behalf of all Removal Defendants (Mueller-Funke, Deena)
February 4, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
February 4, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(CGJ)
February 3, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Occidental Chemical Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Occidental Petroleum Corporation for Occidental Chemical Corporation.. (Hogan, Kevin)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Oxy USA Inc., Corporate Parent Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. for Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc... (Hogan, Kevin)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Oxy USA Inc. for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc... (Hogan, Kevin)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa L. Smith on behalf of Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation (Smith, Lisa)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel A Blanchet on behalf of Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation (Blanchet, Joel)
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Devine on behalf of Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation (Devine, Andrew)
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Deena Katherine Mueller-Funke on behalf of Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation (Mueller-Funke, Deena)
February 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Hogan on behalf of Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation (Hogan, Kevin)
February 1, 2020 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Notice of Removal,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Index 1-50, #2 Exhibit State Court Index 51-88)(Blanchet, Joel)
February 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from NY Supreme Court County of Niagara, case number E152336/2014. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3725505), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Map of CERCLA Site, #3 Exhibit 102 ROD, #4 Exhibit 102 Consent Decree, #5 Exhibit 102 Amended ROD, #6 Exhibit 102 OM&M, #7 Exhibit 102 5 Yr Review, #8 Exhibit SA Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit SA Consent Judgment, #10 Exhibit SA ROD, #11 Exhibit SA OM&M, #12 Exhibit S-Area 5 Year Review, #13 Exhibit HP Consent Judgment, #14 Exhibit HP ROD, #15 Exhibit HP OM&M, #16 Exhibit HP FYRR, #17 Exhibit State Court Index, #18 Civil Cover Sheet with addendum)(Blanchet, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bietz et al v. City of Niagara Falls et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Lee George
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Brundidge, Jr.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Dolson
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Knotts
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan David Hamilton, Sr.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa D'Angelo
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason T. Martin, Sr.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Kutis
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Burnett
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Mackenna
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Chambers
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Brundidge, Sr.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Cole
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria D. Cox
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rico D. Johnson
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa M. Jamieson
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Martin Welch
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tianna T. Hilson
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Henderson
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianco Crowell
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Alexander Hamilton
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Cosimano
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Mackenna
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Howard
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Martin, Jr.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bietz
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel Graham
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Dunn
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte C. Cevaer-Lachat
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Mackenna
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Represented By: Caitlyn Silhan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Christen Civiletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew P. Devine
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan
Represented By: Lisa L. Smith
Represented By: Douglas E. Fleming, III
Represented By: Deena Katherine Mueller-Funke
Represented By: Joel A Blanchet
Represented By: Sheila L. Birnbaum
Represented By: Mara Gonzalez
Represented By: Mara Cusker Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Andrew P. Devine
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan
Represented By: Lisa L. Smith
Represented By: Douglas E. Fleming, III
Represented By: Deena Katherine Mueller-Funke
Represented By: Joel A Blanchet
Represented By: Sheila L. Birnbaum
Represented By: Mara Gonzalez
Represented By: Mara Cusker Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Agnieszka Anna Wilewicz
Represented By: Patricia Rauh
Represented By: David R. Adams
Represented By: Patricia Ann Rauh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew P. Devine
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan
Represented By: Lisa L. Smith
Represented By: Douglas E. Fleming, III
Represented By: Deena Katherine Mueller-Funke
Represented By: Joel A Blanchet
Represented By: Sheila L. Birnbaum
Represented By: Mara Gonzalez
Represented By: Mara Cusker Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Lawn Yard, Inc.
Represented By: Brian F. Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecos International, Inc.
Represented By: Zackary Knaub
Represented By: Steven C. Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conestoga-Rovers & Associates
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Stravino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OP-TECH Environmental Services
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy's Plumbing, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Knoer
Represented By: Alice J. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Niagara Falls
Represented By: Thomas J. DeBoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?