McCoy v. Brinker Restaurant Corporation
Plaintiff: Rebecca McCoy
Defendant: Brinker Restaurant Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00191
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint served on Nancy Doherty, agent for Secretary of State on March 17, 2020, filed by Rebecca McCoy. (Wicka, Kevin)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Nancy Dougherty, agent of Secretary of State on March 17, 2020, filed by Rebecca McCoy. (Wicka, Kevin)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brinker Restaurant Corporation. (CGJ)
February 14, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
February 14, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(CGJ)
February 14, 2020 Case assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brinker Restaurant Corporation $ 400 receipt number 0209-3738418, filed by Rebecca McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wicka, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Brinker Restaurant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca McCoy
Represented By: Kevin P. Wicka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brinker Restaurant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?