United States of America v. Any and All Joint Venture Units of Morgan Interest Holders, et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Any and All Joint Venture Units of Morgan Interest Holders, et al., 140 Westbrook Hills Drive, Syracuse, New York, 2161 Camelot Drive, Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, 1 Oakmonte Boulevard, Webster, New York, Any and All Joint Venture Units of Morgan Interest Holders, 40 Webster Manor Drive, Webster, New York, 5111 Ball Road, Syracuse, New York, 825 Ridgewood Drive, Fort Wayne, Indiana and 137 Ringneck Drive, Harrisburg, Pennslyvania
Claimant: Robert Morgan Limited Partnership III, James Martin, Rocmo 2 LLC, Rocmo 1 LLC, RL Properties #2 LLC, RJM Fund, LLC, York KM Investor LLC, Timothy Florczak, R. Morgan Management III LLC, ZSR Holdings LLC, Robyn Morgan, Lisa Moser, George DeGraca, Rocmo 3 LLC f/k/a Syracusa Properties, Lacey Morgan Katz, Sharon Zinser, Kevin Morgan, Schiavi Properties, R. Morgan Management LLC, RL Properties #1 LLC, Robert C. Morgan, Todd Morgan, Maplewood MHP, Inc., Robert J. Moser, Robert Morgan Limited Partnership and Morgan King Of Prussia Joint Venture LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00334
Filed: March 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 84 TEXT ORDER re #83 Stipulation. In prior filings with the Court, counsel for claimant Chase Chavin ("Claimant") advised that while she was not currently admitted to practice in this District, "an application for admission will be forthcoming." (See, e.g., Dkt. 63 at 3 n.1). Counsel has yet to apply for admission or otherwise appear in the instant matter, and as a result is in violation of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. See L.R. Civ. P. 83.2(b)("[A]n attorney appearing for a party in a civil case shall promptly file a written notice of appearance."). Until counsel for Claimant complies with the Local Rules and files an application for admission, the Court will not approve Claimant's Third Stipulation. The Government is directed to serve a copy of this Text Order on counsel for Claimant via email and mail. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 7/29/2020. (KAC)
July 29, 2020 Filing 83 STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIM DEADLINE by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
July 29, 2020 Filing 82 STIPULATION FOR FORFEITURE by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
July 29, 2020 Filing 81 Third STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for claimants Lacey Morgan Katz, Robyn Morgan, RL Properties #1 LLC, RL Properties #2 LLC, and Rocmo 3 LLC f/k/a Syracusa Properties LLC to file claims and answers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 7/29/2020. (KAC)
July 29, 2020 Filing 80 STIPULATION THIRD EXTENSION TO EXTEND CLAIM DEADLINE by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
July 29, 2020 Filing 79 Third STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for claimant Morgan King Of Prussia Joint Venture LLC to file a claim and answer. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 7/29/2020. (KAC)
July 29, 2020 Filing 78 STIPULATION THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIM DEADLINE by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
July 28, 2020 Filing 77 Third STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for claimants Robert C. Morgan, Todd Morgan, Rocmo 1 LLC, Rocmo 2 LLC, Robert Morgan Limited Partnership, Robert Morgan Limited Partnership III, R. Morgan Management LLC, and R. Morgan Management III LLC to file claims and answers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 7/28/2020. (KAC)
July 28, 2020 Filing 76 Third STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for claimants Alyse D. Brovitz and the Brovitz Family Trust to file claims and answers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 7/28/2020. (KAC)
July 28, 2020 Filing 75 STIPULATION THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANT'S TIME TO FILE CLAIM AND ANSWER IN THE CIVIL FORFEITURE ACTION by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
July 28, 2020 Filing 74 STIPULATION THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIM DEADLINE by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
July 24, 2020 Filing 73 Third STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for claimants Robert J. Moser, Lisa Moser, and the RJM Fund, LLC to file claims and answers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 7/24/2020. (KAC) Modified to attach document on 7/24/2020 (KAC).
July 24, 2020 Filing 72 Third STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for claimants Maplewood MHP, Inc., Schiavi Properties, James Martin, George DeGraca, and their respective heirs, successors, assigns, personal representatives and trustees to file claims and answers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 7/24/2020. (KAC)
July 24, 2020 Filing 71 Third STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for claimant Timothy Florczak to file claims and answers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 7/24/2020. (KAC)
July 23, 2020 Filing 70 STIPULATION THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS TIME TO FILE CLAIM by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
July 23, 2020 Filing 69 STIPULATION THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS TIME TO FILE CLAIM AND ANSWERS IN CIVIL FORFEITURE ACTION FOR DIRECT AND INDIRECT OWNERS by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
July 23, 2020 Filing 68 STIPULATION THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS TIME TO FILE CLAIM AND ANSWER IN CIVIL FORFEITURE ACTION by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
July 2, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D. Robinson on behalf of United States of America (Robinson, Kevin)
June 30, 2020 Filing 66 Second STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for claimants Herbert Morgan; Carla Morgan; H&C Morgan, LLC; Herbert Morgan, LP; Herbert Morgan I, LLC; Herbert Morgan II, LLC; and York HM Investor, LLC to file claims and answers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 06/30/2020. (CDH)
June 30, 2020 Filing 65 Second STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for claimants Robert C. Morgan, Todd Morgan, Rocmo 1 LLC, Rocmo 2 LLC, Robert Morgan Limited Partnership, Robert Morgan Limited Partnership III, R. Morgan Management LLC, and R. Morgan Management III LLC to file claims and answers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 06/30/2020. (CDH)
June 30, 2020 Filing 64 Second STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for claimants Lacey Morgan Katz, Robyn Morgan, RL Properties #1 LLC, RL Properties #2 LLC, and Rocmo 3 LLC f/k/a Syracusa Properties LLC to file claims and answers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 06/30/2020. (CDH)
June 30, 2020 Filing 63 Second STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for claimant Chase Chavin to file claim and answer. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 06/30/2020. (CDH)
June 29, 2020 Filing 62 STIPULATION SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIM AND ANSWER DEADLINES by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
June 26, 2020 Filing 61 STIPULATION SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS' TIME TO FILE CLAIM AND ANSWER IN THE CIVIL FORFEITURE ACTION by Robyn Morgan, Lacey Morgan Katz, RL Properties #1 LLC, RL Properties #2 LLC, Rocmo 3 LLC f/k/a Syracusa Properties, York KM Investor LLC. (McCormack, Thomas)
June 26, 2020 Filing 60 STIPULATION SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR CLAIM AND ANSWER by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
June 26, 2020 Filing 59 STIPULATION SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS' TIME TO FILE CLAIM AND ANSWER by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
June 25, 2020 Filing 58 Second STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for claimants Alyse D. Brovitz and the Brovitz Family Trust to file a claim and answer. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 06/25/2020. (CDH)
June 25, 2020 Filing 57 Second STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for claimants Kevin Morgan and York KM Investor LLC to file a claim and answer. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 06/25/2020. (CDH)
June 25, 2020 Filing 56 Second STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for claimants Robert J. Moser, Lisa Moser and the RJM Fund, LLC to file a claim and answer. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 06/25/2020. (CDH)
June 25, 2020 Filing 55 STIPULATION SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS TIME TO FILE CLAIM AND ANSWER by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
June 25, 2020 Filing 54 STIPULATION SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS TIME TO FILE CLAIM AND ANSWER by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
June 25, 2020 Filing 53 STIPULATION SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS TIME TO FILE CLAIM AND ANSWER by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
June 24, 2020 Filing 52 Second STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Timothy Florczak to file claim and answer. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 06/24/2020. (CDH)
June 23, 2020 Filing 51 STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS TIME by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
June 23, 2020 Filing 50 Second STIPULATION AND ORDER extending claimants' time to file claim and answer. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 06/23/2020. (CDH)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending claimants' time to file claims and answers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 06/23/2020. (CDH)
June 23, 2020 Filing 48 STIPULATION Second Stipulation to Extend Claimants' Time to File Claim and Answer by United States of America, ZSR Holdings LLC, Sharon Zinser. (Clay, Darrell)
June 22, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Inbal P. Garrity on behalf of Morgan King Of Prussia Joint Venture LLC (Garrity, Inbal)
June 22, 2020 Filing 46 STIPULATION SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS' TIME TO FILE CLAIMS AND ANSWERS IN CIVIL FORFEITURE ACTION FOR DIRECT AND INDIRECT OWNERS AND/OR HOLDERS OF ANY BENEFICIAL INTEREST IN RESPECT OF JOINT VENTURE UNITS by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
June 19, 2020 Filing 45 STIPULATION SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANT'S TIME TO FILE CLAIM AND ANSWER IN THE CIVIL FORFEITURE ACTION by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
June 19, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Rither Alabre on behalf of Morgan King Of Prussia Joint Venture LLC (Alabre, Rither)
May 20, 2020 Filing 43 TEXT ORDER granting #41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Thomas J. McCormack; granting #42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Keith M. Rosen. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 05/20/2020. (CDH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
May 18, 2020 Verified admission to the New York State Bar for Attorney Thomas J. McCormack. (MD)
May 18, 2020 Verified admission to the Pennsylvania and District of Columbia State Bar for Attorney Keith M. Rosen. (MD)
May 15, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Keith M. Rosen ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-3834773.) by Robyn Morgan, Lacey Morgan Katz, RL Properties #1 LLC, RL Properties #2 LLC, Rocmo 3 LLC f/k/a Syracusa Properties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Admission Petition Form, #2 Exhibit B - Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C - Attorney's Oath, #4 Exhibit D - Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath, #5 Exhibit E - Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration Form)(Schwinger, Robert)
May 15, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Thomas J. McCormack ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-3834743.) by Robyn Morgan, Lacey Morgan Katz, RL Properties #1 LLC, RL Properties #2 LLC, Rocmo 3 LLC f/k/a Syracusa Properties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Admission Petition Form, #2 Exhibit B - Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C - Attorney's Oath, #4 Exhibit D - Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath, #5 Exhibit E - Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration Form)(Schwinger, Robert)
May 15, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Schwinger on behalf of Lacey Morgan Katz, Robyn Morgan, RL Properties #1 LLC, RL Properties #2 LLC, Rocmo 3 LLC f/k/a Syracusa Properties (Schwinger, Robert)
May 14, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Elizabeth Elmouji on behalf of George DeGraca, Maplewood MHP, Inc., James Martin, Schiavi Properties (Elmouji, Erin)
May 14, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren B. Rosenbaum on behalf of George DeGraca, Maplewood MHP, Inc., James Martin, Schiavi Properties (Rosenbaum, Warren)
May 12, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Ira Lang on behalf of Robert C. Morgan, Todd Morgan, R. Morgan Management III LLC, R. Morgan Management LLC, Robert Morgan Limited Partnership, Robert Morgan Limited Partnership III, Rocmo 1 LLC, Rocmo 2 LLC (Lang, Jeffrey)
May 12, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Cohen on behalf of Robert C. Morgan, Todd Morgan, Rocmo 1 LLC, Rocmo 2 LLC, Robert Morgan Limited Partnership, Robert Morgan Limited Partnership III, R. Morgan Management LLC, R. Morgan Management III LLC (Cohen, Mark)
May 11, 2020 Filing 35 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date May 7, 2020. (Kane, Mary)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Morgan King Of Prussia Joint Venture LLC to file claim and answer. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 05/05/2020. (CDH)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Lacey Morgan Katz, Robyn Morgan, RL Properties #1 LLC, RL Properties #2 LLC, and Rocmo 3 LLC f/k/a Syracusa Properties LLC to file claims and answers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 05/05/2020. (CDH)
May 5, 2020 Filing 32 STIPULATION O EXTEND CLAIMANTS TIME by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
May 4, 2020 Filing 31 STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS TIME by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for claimants Robert C. Morgan, Todd Morgan, Rocmo 1LLC, Rocmo 2 LLC, Robert Morgan Limited Partnership, Robert Morgan Limited Partnership III, R. Morgan Management LLC, and R. Morgan Management III LLC to file claims and answers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 05/01/2020. (CDH)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Chase Chavin to file claim and answer. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 05/01/2020. (CDH)
May 1, 2020 Filing 28 STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS TIME by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Alyse D. Brovitz and the Brovitz Family Trust to file claims and answers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 05/01/2020. (CDH)
May 1, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS TIME by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
May 1, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS TIME by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Robert J. Moser, Lisa Moser and the RJM Fund, LLC to file claims and answers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 04/29/2020. (CDH)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Herbert Morgan; Carla Morgan; H&C Morgan,LLC; Herbert Morgan, LP; Herbert Morgan I, LLC; Herbert Morgan II, LLC; and York HM Investor, LLC to file claims and answers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 04/29/2020. (CDH)
April 29, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS TIME by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
April 28, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS TIME by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Timothy Florczak to file claim and answer. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 04/28/2020. (CDH)
April 28, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS TIME by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
April 28, 2020 E-Filing Notification: Clerk revised docket text of #14 and #17 to clarify the filings events. (JHF)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Sharon Zinser and ZSR Holdings LLC to file claims and answers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 04/27/2020. (CDH)
April 27, 2020 Filing 17 CORRECTED STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Kevin Morgan and York KM Investor LLC to file claims and answers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 04/27/2020. (CDH) Modified on 4/28/2020 (JHF).
April 27, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS TIME by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for claimants to file claims and answers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 04/27/2020. (CDH)
April 27, 2020 Filing 14 CORRECTED STIPULATION by Any and All Joint Venture Units of Morgan Interest Holders. (Brown, Patrick) Modified on 4/28/2020 (JHF).
April 27, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION by Any and All Joint Venture Units of Morgan Interest Holders. (Brown, Patrick)
April 24, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America as to Herb Morgan c/o Seetha Ramachandran Proskauer (Kane, Mary)
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION FIRST STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIMANTS TIME TO FILE CLAIMS AND ANSWERS by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 WARRANT Returned Executed as to Joint Venture Units of Morgan Interest Holders c/o Rither Alabre, Blankrome. (JLV)
April 7, 2020 E-Filing Notification: Clerk revised docket text of #9 NOTICE of Appearance to clarify the filing event. (JHF)
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Duncan Patrick Levin on behalf of Robert J. Moser, Lisa Moser and RJM Fund, LLC. (Levin, Duncan) Modified on 4/7/2020 (JHF).
April 3, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Kane, Mary)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Kane, Mary)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Kane, Mary)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Kane, Mary)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Kane, Mary)
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture/Warrant in Rem Issued by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court. (CGJ)
March 23, 2020 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
March 23, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary C. Kane on behalf of United States of America (Kane, Mary)
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against Any and All Joint Venture Units of Morgan Interest Holders, et al., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Arrest Warrant In Rem, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kane, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Any and All Joint Venture Units of Morgan Interest Holders, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any and All Joint Venture Units of Morgan Interest Holders, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 140 Westbrook Hills Drive, Syracuse, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2161 Camelot Drive, Harrisburg, Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1 Oakmonte Boulevard, Webster, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any and All Joint Venture Units of Morgan Interest Holders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 40 Webster Manor Drive, Webster, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5111 Ball Road, Syracuse, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 825 Ridgewood Drive, Fort Wayne, Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 137 Ringneck Drive, Harrisburg, Pennslyvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mary C. Kane
Represented By: Kevin D. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert Morgan Limited Partnership III
Represented By: Mark S. Cohen
Represented By: Jeffrey Ira Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James Martin
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Elmouji
Represented By: Warren B. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rocmo 2 LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Cohen
Represented By: Jeffrey Ira Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rocmo 1 LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Cohen
Represented By: Jeffrey Ira Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: RL Properties #2 LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Schwinger
Represented By: Thomas J. McCormack
Represented By: Keith M Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: RJM Fund, LLC
Represented By: Duncan Patrick Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: York KM Investor LLC
Represented By: Patrick J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Timothy Florczak
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: Andrew M. Debbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: R. Morgan Management III LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Cohen
Represented By: Jeffrey Ira Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ZSR Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robyn Morgan
Represented By: Robert A. Schwinger
Represented By: Thomas J. McCormack
Represented By: Keith M Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lisa Moser
Represented By: Duncan Patrick Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: George DeGraca
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Elmouji
Represented By: Warren B. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rocmo 3 LLC f/k/a Syracusa Properties
Represented By: Robert A. Schwinger
Represented By: Thomas J. McCormack
Represented By: Keith M Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lacey Morgan Katz
Represented By: Robert A. Schwinger
Represented By: Thomas J. McCormack
Represented By: Keith M Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sharon Zinser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kevin Morgan
Represented By: Patrick J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Schiavi Properties
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Elmouji
Represented By: Warren B. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: R. Morgan Management LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Cohen
Represented By: Jeffrey Ira Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: RL Properties #1 LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Schwinger
Represented By: Thomas J. McCormack
Represented By: Keith M Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert C. Morgan
Represented By: Mark S. Cohen
Represented By: Jeffrey Ira Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Todd Morgan
Represented By: Mark S. Cohen
Represented By: Jeffrey Ira Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Maplewood MHP, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Elmouji
Represented By: Warren B. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert J. Moser
Represented By: Duncan Patrick Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert Morgan Limited Partnership
Represented By: Mark S. Cohen
Represented By: Jeffrey Ira Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Morgan King Of Prussia Joint Venture LLC
Represented By: Inbal P. Garrity
Represented By: Rither Alabre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?