Sinatra et al v. Walmart Inc. d/b/a Walmart Supercenter
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Sinatra and Michael Sinatra, Individually and as Husband and Wife
Defendant: Walmart Inc. d/b/a Walmart Supercenter
Case Number: 1:2020cv00851
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael J Roemer
Referring Judge: John L Sinatra
2 Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 E-Filing Notification: Incorrect.pdf file attached to entry. #7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Correct document now attached.(RAZ)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.)Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 9/21/2020. Mandatory Disclosures due by 9/21/2020. First Mediation Session due by 10/30/2020. Motions to Compel Discovery due by 1/8/2021. Discovery completed by 2/1/2021. Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 3/1/2021. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 4/16/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/9/2021. Mediation To End by 7/9/2021. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 8/17/2020. (RAZ) (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/17/2020) (RAZ).
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Walmart Inc. d/b/a Walmart Supercenter. (Will, Pauline)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Michael J. Roemer, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 7/22/2020. (KLH)
July 21, 2020 Case reassigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr.. Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo no longer assigned to the case. (TF)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER. Judge Vilardo hereby recuses himself in this case and requests the Clerk of Court to assign another District Judge. SO ORDERED. Issed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/20/2020. (CMD)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc. d/b/a Walmart Supercenter. (Will, Pauline)
July 9, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
July 9, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
July 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. d/b/a Walmart Supercenter from Erie County Supreme Court, case number 814839/2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3894845), filed by Walmart Inc. d/b/a Walmart Supercenter. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Will, Pauline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sinatra et al v. Walmart Inc. d/b/a Walmart Supercenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc. d/b/a Walmart Supercenter
Represented By: Pauline Costanzo Will
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Sinatra
Represented By: William A. Lorenz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sinatra, Individually and as Husband and Wife
Represented By: William A. Lorenz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?