Engquist v. Sun Communities, Inc.
Plaintiff: Amy E Engquist
Defendant: Sun Communities, Inc. and Sun Jelly WNY-RV LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00910
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 Answer to Amended Complaint ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Sun Communities, Inc., Sun Jelly WNY-RV LLC.(Slavina Farmer, Jana)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Sun Communities, Inc. on August 10, 2020, filed by Amy E Engquist. (Schiller, Mary)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sun Jelly WNY-RV LLC. (KM)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Amy E Engquist. to #4 Amended Complaint Summonses filed by Amy E Engquist. (Schiller, Mary)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT Amy E. Engquist against All Defendants, filed by Amy E Engquist.(Schiller, Mary)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION to Join Necessary Party and Remand Action by Amy E Engquist. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schiller, Mary)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sun Communities, Inc. (CGJ)
July 17, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
July 17, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Amy E. Engquist against Sun Communities, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3905462, filed by Amy E Engquist. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Schiller, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engquist v. Sun Communities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy E Engquist
Represented By: Mary B. Schiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Communities, Inc.
Represented By: Jana A. Slavina Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Jelly WNY-RV LLC
Represented By: Jana A. Slavina Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?