Sommerville v. MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tauniece Sommerville
Defendant: MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc. and Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01069
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION Partial Discontinuance & to Remand and Remand Order by MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Barnas, Brian)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit C - Correspondence to Counsel, #5 Memorandum in Support)(Barnas, Brian)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D Barnas on behalf of MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc. (Barnas, Brian)
August 12, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
August 12, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
August 12, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Thomas Parlato on behalf of Tauniece Sommerville (Parlato, Vincent)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc., Other Affiliate Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company for MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc... (Kohane, Dan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc. aka Metroplitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company from Supreme Court Erie County, case number 807351/2020. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3934310), filed by MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index, #2 Exhibit B - Summons & Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(Kohane, Dan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sommerville v. MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Dan D. Kohane
Represented By: Brian D Barnas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Dan D. Kohane
Represented By: Brian D Barnas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tauniece Sommerville
Represented By: Vincent Thomas Parlato
Represented By: Brittany L. Penberthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?