Gillette et al v. Carter Express, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donald E. Gillette, Jr. and Bethany Gillette
Defendant: Star Leasing Company of Indiana, Christopher J. Ray, Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc., Carter Express, Inc. and Star Leasing Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01095
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah J McCarthy
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER - Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall not hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C), unless further ordered by this Court. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 10/15/2020. (CMD)
October 15, 2020 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Carter Express, Inc., Christopher J. Ray, Star Leasing Company, Star Leasing Company of Indiana by Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc..(Wescoe, James)
October 14, 2020 E-Filing Notification: Incorrect.pdf file attached to entry. Action required: re-file entry with correct document re 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Clerk to modify entry and removed.pdf. (TF)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 Filed in error, removed .pdf - ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against Carter Express, Inc., Christopher J. Ray, Star Leasing Company, Star Leasing Company of Indiana by Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc..(Wescoe, James) Modified on 10/14/2020 (TF).
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Christopher J. Ray on 09/21/2020, filed by Bethany Gillette, Donald E. Gillette, Jr. (Vona, Keith)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Carter Express, Inc. on 09/03/2020, filed by Bethany Gillette, Donald E. Gillette, Jr. (Vona, Keith)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Star Leasing Company on 08/24/2020, filed by Bethany Gillette, Donald E. Gillette, Jr. (Vona, Keith)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc. on 08/26/20, filed by Bethany Gillette, Donald E. Gillette, Jr. (Vona, Keith)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Star Leasing Company of Indiana on 08/24/2020, filed by Bethany Gillette, Donald E. Gillette, Jr. (Vona, Keith)
August 17, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF)
August 17, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Carter Express, Inc., Christopher J. Ray, Star Leasing Company, Star Leasing Company of Indiana, Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc. (JHF)
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3940040, filed by Donald E. Gillette, Jr, Bethany Gillette. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vona, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillette et al v. Carter Express, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald E. Gillette, Jr.
Represented By: Keith R. Vona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany Gillette
Represented By: Keith R. Vona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Leasing Company of Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc.
Represented By: James A. Wescoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Leasing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?