Trask v. Town of Alma
Plaintiff: Brian Trask
Defendant: Town of Alma and International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 1508
Case Number: 1:2020cv01111
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Unassigned. Fee not paid, case never assigned to a Judge. Motion to withdraw was granted and the case was closed. (TF)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Letter request to withdraw the Notice of Removal. Signed by Hon. Christina Reiss on 9/1/2020. (KM)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 Letter filed by Brian Trask as to International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 1508, Town of Alma Letter Request to Rescind Notice of Removal and Strike Matter from Cour's Docket. (Geraci, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ORDER to Show Cause why this case should not be stricken for failure to pay fee or submit motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The deadline to respond to this Order to Show Cause is 9/28/2020. Failure to comply with this order will result in this case being stricken from the court docket. Signed by Hon. Christina Reiss on 8/27/2020. (TF)
August 21, 2020 E-Filing Notification: #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. No fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted and advised they have 24 hours to resolve matter. (TF)
August 21, 2020 E-Filing Notification: #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL - Clerk modified docket to correct party roles and to correct case short title. (TF)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brian Trask from Monroe County Supreme Court, case number E2020001926. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification of Counsel, #3 Index of Documents, #4 Index #1, #5 Index #2, #6 Index #3, #7 Index #4, #8 Index #5, #9 Index #6, #10 Index #7, #11 Index #8, #12 Index #9, #13 Index #10)(Geraci, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trask v. Town of Alma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Alma
Represented By: Edward A. Trevvett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 1508
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Trask
Represented By: Michael Frank Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?