The Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Main Street America Assurance Company
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Defendant: Main Street America Assurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01153
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cincinnati Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for The Cincinnati Insurance Company.. (Vahey, Laurie)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Main Street America Assurance Company. (Gerber, Daniel)
September 16, 2020 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 Verified ANSWER to Complaint by Main Street America Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Daniel W. Gerber)(Gerber, Daniel)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie A. Vahey on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Vahey, Laurie)
August 27, 2020 Remark: Filing fee paid twice. Please refer to refund policy located on our website: www.nywd.uscourts.gov (JD)
August 27, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
August 27, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
August 27, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Jacob Aisen on behalf of Main Street America Assurance Company (Aisen, Aaron)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Main Street America Assurance Company from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Niagara, case number E172567/2020. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3952948), filed by Main Street America Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Affirmation of Service on Defendant MSA, #3 Exhibit C: Underlying Litigation Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service of Daniel W. Gerber)(Gerber, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Main Street America Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Laurie A. Vahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Street America Assurance Company
Represented By: Daniel W. Gerber
Represented By: Aaron Jacob Aisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?