Hammond v. Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York
Plaintiff: Lori Hammond
Defendant: Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York
Case Number: 1:2020cv01192
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lori Hammond (Pfaff, E.)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Defendant's #5 letter request for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 11/9/2020. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 10/8/2020. (KLH)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York.. (Decker, Byrne)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York.(Decker, Byrne)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York. (CGJ)
September 8, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
September 8, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
September 8, 2020 Case assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 Original Summons Filed. (Pfaff, E.)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Lori Hammond. filed by Lori Hammond. (Pfaff, E.)
September 3, 2020 E-Filing Notification: RE #1 COMPLAINT, Attorney shall file a Civil Cover Sheet, using the the Continuation of Exhibits event, found under Responses and Replies. (SG)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York $ 400 receipt number 0209-3961219, filed by Lori Hammond.(Pfaff, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammond v. Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Hammond
Represented By: E. Peter Pfaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York
Represented By: Byrne Joseph Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?