Admiral Insurance Company v. Try-Lock Roofing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Admiral Insurance Company
Defendant: Derek Orlando, East Amherst fire Department, Inc and Try-Lock Roofing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01398
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: H Kenneth Schroeder
Referring Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER regarding issuance of Case Management Order. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 11/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order Form, #2 Consent Memorandum, #3 Consent Form)(LMG)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr., United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 11/16/2020. (KLH)
November 13, 2020 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant Try-Lock Roofing, Inc's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses and Setoff, COUNTERCLAIM against Admiral Insurance Company by Try-Lock Roofing, Inc..(Manna, Joseph)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER. The Court grants Defendant Try-Lock Roofing, Inc.'s unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer the complaint. Defendant Try-Lock's answer is due by 11/12/2020. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 11/2/2020. (KEF)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer by Try-Lock Roofing, Inc..(Manna, Joseph)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Manna on behalf of Try-Lock Roofing, Inc. (Manna, Joseph)
October 19, 2020 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to East Amherst fire Department, Inc, Try-Lock Roofing, Inc. (CGJ)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 Original Summons Filed. (Sambursky, Neil)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Sambursky, Neil)
October 1, 2020 Original summons not submitted. (JD)
October 1, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
October 1, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
October 1, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3993814, filed by Admiral Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT F)(Sambursky, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Admiral Insurance Company v. Try-Lock Roofing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Admiral Insurance Company
Represented By: Neil L. Sambursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Orlando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Amherst fire Department, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Try-Lock Roofing, Inc.
Represented By: Todd J. Aldinger
Represented By: Joseph J. Manna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?