GEICO Indemnity Company v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company a/s/o Dawn Gugliuzza and GEICO Indemnity Company
Defendant: Joshua Anderson and CURTIS ARISTARCHUS
Case Number: 1:2020cv01551
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Leslie G Foschio
Referring Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER acknowledging #8 Stipulation of Dismissal. This action is now dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 12/9/2020. (KLH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Joshua Anderson, Curtis Aristarchus. (Schechter, Joel)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER re #6 Stipulation of Dismissal: The parties are directed to re-file the stipulation to include signatures of counsel who have appeared in this action. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 12/1/2020. (KLH)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Joshua Anderson, Curtis Aristarchus. (Schechter, Joel)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER. As the parties have informed the court the case is settled, the Scheduling Conference set for 12/29/2020 is cancelled. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 11/19/2020. (SDW)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 12/29/2020 12:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 11/17/2020. (SDW)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Leslie G. Foschio, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 11/9/2020. (KLH)
October 23, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
October 23, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
October 23, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter D. Cantone on behalf of CURTIS ARISTARCHUS, Joshua Anderson (Cantone, Peter)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CURTIS ARISTARCHUS, Joshua Anderson from Erie County Supreme Court, case number 805576/2020. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-4021291), filed by CURTIS ARISTARCHUS, Joshua Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S&C, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Exhibit Order, #4 Exhibit Docket List & Docs, #5 Errata Not of Filing of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schechter, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GEICO Indemnity Company v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company a/s/o Dawn Gugliuzza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Bryan M. Kulak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Anderson
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Represented By: Peter D. Cantone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURTIS ARISTARCHUS
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Represented By: Peter D. Cantone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?