United States of America v. $114,063.53 United States Currency Seized from Bank of America Account #8936
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $114,063.53 United States Currency Seized from Bank of America Account #8936
Claimant: Steve Warzala, Patricia Brown and Joseph C. Bella, III
Case Number: 1:2020cv01931
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Leslie G Foschio
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1341
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CLAIM by Patricia Brown. (CGJ)
February 8, 2021 Filing 10 WARRANT IN REM Returned Executed as to $114,063.53 United States Currency Seized from Bank of America Account #8936. (CGJ)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2021 12:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 2/4/2021. (SDW)(AT&T Teleconference Participant Instructions emailed to counsel 2/4/2021) (Main Document 9 replaced on 2/4/2021 to correct spelling of Claimant name) (SDW).
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Leslie G. Foschio, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 2/2/2021. (CMD)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 CLAIM by Med-Cor. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Eoannou, Thomas)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 CLAIM Return of $12,800 by $114,063.53 United States Currency Seized from Bank of America Account #8936. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Eoannou, Thomas)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Robinson, Kevin)
January 21, 2021 AMENDED ARREST WARRANT IN REM issued by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court. (KM)
January 14, 2021 E-Filing Notification: Arrest Warrant in Rem was issued once. (KM)
January 12, 2021 Case reassigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (TF)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL: I hereby recuse myself from further involvement in this matter and ask the Clerk of the Court to reassign this matter to another district judge. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 1/11/2021. (KLH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
January 6, 2021 ARREST WARRANT IN REM issued by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court (SG)
January 6, 2021 Case assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
January 6, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
January 6, 2021 **Disregard entry enter in error***Arrest Warrant in Rem issued by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court. (KM) Modified on 1/14/2021 (KM).
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint, Revised Arrest Warrant In Rem. (Carducci, Grace)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace M. Carducci on behalf of United States of America (Carducci, Grace)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $114,063.53 United States Currency Seized from Bank of America Account #8936, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Arrest Warrant In Rem, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carducci, Grace)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $114,063.53 United States Currency Seized from Bank of America Account #8936
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $114,063.53 United States Currency Seized from Bank of America Account #8936
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Grace M. Carducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Steve Warzala
Represented By: Thomas J. Eoannou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Patricia Brown
Represented By: Phillip C. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joseph C. Bella, III
Represented By: Thomas J. Eoannou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?